EP3283868 - CORROSION TIME PROFILE MEASUREMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheonics GmbH Technoparkstr. 2 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Sunil Schlossmuehlestr. 129 8408 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
HAEUSLER, Klaus Sillerwies 10 8053 Zurich / CH | 03 /
GOODBREAD, Joseph, H. Technoparkstr. 2 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Snipe, Benjamin Thomas Fletcher Snipe Chandrahasen LLP 6th Floor, Platf9rm, Tower Point 44 North Road Brighton BN1 1YR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Smith, Jeremy Robert, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16781018.3 | 18.04.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016US28156 | Priority number, date | US201562149392P | 17.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562149392 P | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016168842 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283868 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N17/04, G01N29/265 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
G01N17/04 (EP,CN,US);
G01N29/022 (EP,CN,US);
G01N29/036 (EP,CN);
G01N29/265 (EP);
G01N2291/0258 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2291/02818 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | KORROSIONSZEITPROFILMESSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/08] | English: | CORROSION TIME PROFILE MEASUREMENT DEVICE | [2018/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE PROFIL CHRONOLOGIQUE DE CORROSION | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 15.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 09.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007199379 (WOLF HENRY A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,14,15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] *; | [AD]WO2012012508 (GOODBREAD JOE [US], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2012106387 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014193808 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2002178787 (MATSIEV LEONID [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0024]-[0026], [0047], claims 1, 18 and figures la-4b. *; | [A]US2007159187 (CHEN WEIGUO [CN], et al) [A] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0028], [0048] and figures 6A-6B. *; | [A]US2002105346 (BANKS RODNEY H [US]) [A] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0017], [0021], [0035]-[0040] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2002178805 (DIFOGGIO ROCCO [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0011] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2008215245 (REITTINGER PETER W [US]) [A] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0007], [0035], [0039] and figures 1-7. * | by applicant | US8291750 | US9267872 |