EP3352669 - SPECTRAL IMAGING PHANTOM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAERR, Heiner High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KOEHLER, Thomas High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | van Iersel, Hannie Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16781300.5 | 22.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016EP72570 | Priority number, date | EP20150186385 | 23.09.2015 Original published format: EP 15186385 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017050914 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352669 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, G09B23/28, A61B6/03 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/583 (US);
G09B23/286 (EP,US);
G09B23/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | SPEKTRALABBILDUNGSPHANTOM UND VERFAHREN | [2018/31] | English: | SPECTRAL IMAGING PHANTOM AND METHOD | [2018/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET FANTÔME D'IMAGERIE SPECTRALE | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.03.2020 | 11.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 06.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4233507 (VOLZ DONALD J) [X] 1,2,9 * column 3, line 24 - column 3, line 65; figures 3,4 * * column 2, line 11 - line 16 * [Y] 18; | [XYI]WO2008046498 (VAMP VERFAHREN UND APP DER MED [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10-17,21 * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 12; figure 1 * * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 11; claims 1-4 * [Y] 18,19 [I] 20; | [X]US2008137803 (WU XIAOYE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; figure 6 *; | [X]US2008226017 (ALTMAN AMAIZ [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,15* paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2012155617 (DUTTA SANDEEP [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-17 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0046]; figures 5-8 *; | [Y] - CHRISTOPH HERRMANN ET AL, "Performance simulation of an x-ray detector for spectral CT with combined Si and Cd[Zn]Te detection layers;Performance simulation of an x-ray detector for spectral CT", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL GB, (20101126), vol. 55, no. 24, doi:10.1088/0031-9155/55/24/020, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 7697 - 7713, XP020201090 [Y] 19 * section 3.1 on p. 7704-7706 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/55/24/020 | by applicant | WO2008046498 | US2012155617 | - ALVAREZ, R. E, "Estimator for photon counting energy selective x-ray imaging with multi-bin pulse height analysis", MED. PHYS., (2011), vol. 38, pages 2324 - 2334 | - ROESSL, E.; PROKSA, R, "K-edge imaging in x-ray computed tomography using multi-bin photon counting detectors", PHYS. MED. BIOL., (2007), vol. 52, doi:doi:10.1088/0031-9155/52/15/020, pages 4679 - 4696, XP020113001 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/52/15/020 |