EP3361874 - DRY DAIRY PRODUCT IN SOLID FORM, AND PROCESS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/34] | DRY DAIRY PRODUCT IN SOLID FORM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | ||
[2020/51] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Laitiere Europeenne 50890 Conde-sur-Vire / FR | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORELLE, Dominique 44 bis rue des Gouronnieres 49100 Angers / FR | 02 /
LAROCHE, Christophe 44 rue Pipon 35300 Fougeres / FR | 03 /
KERRIOU, Liliane La belle rivière 35340 Liffre / FR | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2021/10] |
Former [2018/34] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16781790.7 | 14.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016EP74675 | Priority number, date | FR20150059823 | 15.10.2015 Original published format: FR 1559823 | [2018/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017064239 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3361874 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3361874 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/18, A23C9/20 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
A23C9/18 (EP);
A23C9/16 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/202, A23V2250/612, A23V2300/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTES TROCKENMILCHPRODUKT, UND VERFAHREN ZUR DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2020/51] | English: | DRY DAIRY PRODUCT IN SOLID FORM, AND PROCESS OF MANUFACTURE | [2020/51] | French: | PRODUIT LAITIER SEC SOUS FORME SOLIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/34] | TROCKENES MILCHPRODUKT IN FESTER FORM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2018/34] | DRY DAIRY PRODUCT IN SOLID FORM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 13.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.2021
14.12.2021
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Wohlfahrt, Jan Günther, et al, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/03] | 03.01.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.05.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 20.02.2024 | Appeal received No. T0290/24 | 20.02.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.04.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2021/46] | SM | 10.03.2021 | Cited in | International search | [I]US3241975 (BROCHNER HENRY S) [I] 1-4,6-9,11 * column 1, lines 8-15,50-68 * * column 2, lines 1-7, 52-65 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 17 * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]GB1204445 (LAMB ANTHONY HENRY [US]) [A] 1-11* column 2, lines 12-36 *; | [ID]EP1048216 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [ID] 1,3-7,9-11 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0010] - [0014] - [0018] - [0022] * * example 2 *; | [I]CN102845526 (UNIV NANJING CHINESE MEDICINE) [I] 1-11 * examples 1,5,6,7,9,10 *; | [IA]CN103238670 (UNIV JILIN) [I] 6-9,11 * the whole document * [A] 1-5; | [IA]CN104719481 (INNER MONGOLIA YILI IND GROUP) [I] 6-11 * the whole document * [A] 1-5 | by applicant | EP1048216 | EP1769682 | Opposition | GB894001 | US3241975 | JP2000279087 | EP1048216 | WO2004023896 | WO2011158480 | WO2012099471 | CN104719481 | WO2017064239 | - C. AGUILAR et al., "Physical and Microscopic Characterization of Dry Whole Milk with Altered Lactose Content .1. Effect of Lactose Concentration", J. DairySci, (19940000), vol. 77, doi:10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(94)77057-0, pages 1189 - 1197, XP000446065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(94)77057-0 | - JH. GUO, "Lactose in pharmaceutical applications", Drug development & delivery, (20040000), vol. 4, no. 5, XP055464411 | - H.V. VAN KAMP et al., "Studies on tableting properties of lactose. IV. Dissolution and disintegration properties of different types of crystalline lactose", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (19860000), vol. 28, doi:10.1016/0378-5173(86)90249-8, pages 229 - 238, XP025531075 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(86)90249-8 | - H. VROMANS et al., "Studies on tableting properties of lactose. VIII. The effect of variations in primary par- ticle size, percentage of amorphous lactose and addition of a disintegrant on the disinte- gration of spray-dried lactose tablets", International Journal of Phar- maceutics, (19870000), vol. 39, pages 201 - 206, XP023725979 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(87)90217-1 | - A. PUGLIESE et al., "Physical characterization of whole and skim milk powders", J Food Sci Technol, vol. 54, no. 11, doi:10.1007/s13197-017-2795-1, pages 3433 - 3442, XP036333614 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13197-017-2795-1 | - N. KHAOWPHAN et al., "Nutritional Values and Stability of Goat Milk Tablets", Mahidol University Journal of Pharmaceutical Science, (20100000), vol. 37, no. 3-4, pages 12 - 20, XP055910236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.14457/mu.the.2010.335 | - Kuntsche Judith, Alfredfahr, "9. Tabletten ", Voigt Pharmazeutische Technologie. Für Studium und Beruf, Deutscher Verlag Apotheker, (20210101), pages 291 - 305, XP093134649 |