EP3362927 - METHODS ASSOCIATED WITH A DATABASE THAT STORES A PLURALITY OF REFERENCE GENOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genome Research Limited Wellcome Sanger Institute Wellcome Genome Campus Hinxton, Saffron Walden CB10 1SA / GB | [2024/10] |
Former [2018/34] | For all designated states Genome Research Limited Wellcome Trust Genome Campus Hinxton Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB10 1SA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWLEY, Trevor D. Genome Research Limited 215 Euston Road London Greater London NW1 2BF / GB | 02 /
BROWNE, Hilary P. Genome Research Limited 215 Euston Road London Greater London NW1 2BF / GB | 03 /
FORSTER, Sam C. Genome Research Limited 215 Euston Road London Greater London NW1 2BF / GB | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 16782216.2 | 14.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016EP74739 | Priority number, date | GB20150018364 | 16.10.2015 Original published format: GB 201518364 | [2018/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017064263 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3362927 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3362927 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G16B10/00, G16B30/00, G16B50/00, G16B50/30 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G16B10/00 (EP,US);
G16B30/00 (EP,US);
G16B50/00 (US);
G16B50/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/34] | G06F19/14, G06F19/22, G06F19/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EINER DATENBANK, DIE EINE VIELZAHL VON REFERENZGENOMEN SPEICHERT | [2018/34] | English: | METHODS ASSOCIATED WITH A DATABASE THAT STORES A PLURALITY OF REFERENCE GENOMES | [2018/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS À UNE BASE DE DONNÉES CONSERVANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE GÉNOMES DE RÉFÉRENCE | [2018/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 11.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.01.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]US2014045744 (GORDON JEFFREY I [US], et al); | by applicant | US2014045744 |