EP3287819 - MULTILAYER FILM MANUFACTURING METHOD AND MULTILAYER FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2020 [2020/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2018/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA Akira c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Masakazu c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/09] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16783062.9 | 12.04.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016JP61824 | Priority number, date | JP20150089498 | 24.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015089498 | [2018/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016171041 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3287819 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, G02B5/30, B05D7/24, B32B7/02, B32B27/00, H01L51/50, H05B33/02, C09D133/14 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (KR);
B05D1/265 (US);
B05D3/067 (US);
B05D5/06 (US);
B05D7/24 (EP,US);
B32B27/00 (EP,US);
B32B37/24 (KR);
C09K19/061 (KR);
G02B5/30 (EP,US);
G02B5/3016 (KR,US);
G02B5/3083 (KR);
H05B33/02 (EP,US);
H10K50/00 (US);
B32B2305/55 (KR);
B32B2307/40 (KR);
C08J2355/00 (EP,US);
C08J2433/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/09] | G02B5/30, B05D7/24, B32B7/02, B32B27/00, H01L51/50, H05B33/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MEHRLAGIGE FUNKTIONSFOLIE SOWIE MEHRLAGIGE FUNKTIONSFOLIE | [2018/09] | English: | MULTILAYER FILM MANUFACTURING METHOD AND MULTILAYER FILM | [2018/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FILM MULTICOUCHE ET FILM MULTICOUCHE | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2017 | Translation filed | 23.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 23.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/05] | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAY]US5132147 (TAKIGUCHI YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [XD] 7 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 55 * [A] 2,3,5,6[Y] 4; | [XDAYI]JP2008209509 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [XD] 1,2,5,7 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0013] - [0017] * [A] 3 [Y] 4 [I] 6; | [E]EP3064969 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-7 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [0 14] - [0016] - [ 252] - [0254] - [ 256] - [0260]; examples 3,5,6 *; | [E]WO2017154598 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-7 * examples 1-6; claims 1,7 * | International search | [X]WO2013018526 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * , each example *; | [X]WO2014065243 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * , each example & EP 2910986 A1 & CN 104737044 A & KR 10-2015-0073177 A & TW 201418802 A *; | [X]WO2014069515 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * , each example & CN 104769464 A & KR 10-2015-0081273 A & TW 201425542 A *; | [PX]WO2015137446 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-7* , each example & TW 201539092 A * |