EP3285756 - FORMULATIONS OF L-ORNITHINE PHENYLACETATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocera Therapeutics, Inc. 675 McDonnell Blvd. Hazelwood, MO 63042 / US | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/08] | For all designated states Ocera Therapeutics, Inc. 555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 615 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | ||
Former [2018/09] | For all designated states Ocera Therapeutics, Inc. 555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 615 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUETTIMANN, Kenneth 7104 Pebble Gate Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | 02 /
COFFIN, Mark 5001 South Miami Boulevard Suite 300 Durham, NC 27703 / US | 03 /
BERNSTEIN, James 7413 Six Forks Road 312 Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 04 /
GOODSON, Gary 7413 Six Forks Road 312 Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 05 /
WANG, Laurene 512 Booth Road Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/08] |
Former [2018/09] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16783692.3 | 19.04.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016US28298 | Priority number, date | US201562150238P | 20.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562150238 P | US201562150676P | 21.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562150676 P | US201562211619P | 28.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562211619 P | US201562255300P | 13.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562255300 P | US201662276754P | 08.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662276754 P | [2018/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016172112 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3285756 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3285756 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/195, A61K31/192, A61P1/16, A61K9/08 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K9/0053 (CN,KR,US);
A61K31/222 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/5026 (KR,US);
A61K9/5047 (KR,US);
A61K9/5089 (KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,CN,RU);
A61P25/00 (CN);
A61P3/00 (EP,CN);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/222, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2018/09] | A61K31/198, A61K31/192, A61K31/195, A61P1/16, C07C57/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN VON L-ORNITHIN-PHENYLACETAT | [2018/09] | English: | FORMULATIONS OF L-ORNITHINE PHENYLACETATE | [2018/09] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE PHÉNYLACÉTATE DE L-ORNITHINE | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 18.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.01.2023 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | EP23157390.8 / EP4205735 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.02.2023 | |
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006056794 (UCL BIOMEDICA PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 3, lines 15-17; figure 10 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 21 * * page 13, line 18 - page 17, line 20; example 13 * * page 36, lines 25-27; claims 1-11,15 *; | [X]WO2010144498 (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraphs [0144] - [0146]; examples 1-6 *; | [I] - VENTURA-COTS MERITXELL ET AL, "Safety of Ornithine Phenylacetate in Cirrhotic Decompensated Patients : An Open-label, Dose-escalating, Single-cohort Study", vol. 47, no. 10, doi:10.1097/MCG.0B013E318299C789, ISSN 0192-0790, (20130101), pages 881 - 887, JOURNAL OF CLINICAL GASTROENTEROLOGY, RAVEN PRESS LTD., NEW YORK, NY, US, URL: http://content.wkhealth.com/linkback/openurl?sid=WKPTLP:landingpage&an=00004836-201311000-00013, XP009507196 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MCG.0b013e318299c789 | [I] - JALAN R ET AL, "l-Ornithine phenylacetate (OP): A novel treatment for hyperammonemia and hepatic encephalopathy", MEDICAL HYPOTHESES, EDEN PRESS, PENRITH, US, (20070427), vol. 69, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.MEHY.2006.12.061, ISSN 0306-9877, pages 1064 - 1069, XP029096478 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mehy.2006.12.061 | [I] - YTREBO LARS MARIUS ET AL, "L-ornithine phenylacetate attenuates increased arterial and extracellular brain ammonia and prevents intracranial hypertension in pigs with acute liver failure", HEPATOLOGY, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1002/HEP.22917, ISSN 0270-9139, (20090701), pages 165 - 174, (20090218), XP009164051 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.22917 | [X] - Rune Gangsøy Kristiansen ET AL, "L-Ornithine phenylacetate reduces ammonia in pigs with acute liver failure through phenylacetylglycine formation: a novel ammonia-lowering pathway", American journal of physiology. Gastrointestinal and liver physiology, United States, doi:10.1152/ajpgi.00244.2014, (20141115), pages G1024 - G1031, URL: https://www.physiology.org/doi/full/10.1152/ajpgi.00244.2014, XP055532599 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpgi.00244.2014 | [X] - VAIRAPPAN BALASUBRAMANIYAN ET AL, "Ammonia reduction with ornithine phenylacetate restores brain eNOS activity via the DDAH-ADMA pathway in bile duct-ligated cirrhotic rats", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY - GASTROINTESTINAL AND LIVER PHYSIOLOGY, US, (20120101), vol. 302, no. 1, doi:10.1152/ajpgi.00097.2011, ISSN 0193-1857, pages G145 - G152, XP055532625 [X] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpgi.00097.2011 | International search | [X]WO2006056794 (UCL BIOMEDICA PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-57 * See abstract, page 2, lines 4-6, page 9, lines 12-14, page 10, lines 16-17, page 11, lines 21-33, page 1, line 33-page 12, line 5, page 14, lines 17-26, page 17, lines 4-7 and lines 18-20. *; | [X]WO2010115055 (OCERA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-57 * See [0034], [0035], [0092], [0102], [0103], [0106], [0151], [0157], [0158]. *; | [XY]WO2010144498 (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-57 * See abstract, [0005], [0033], [0034], [0043], [0061], [0071], [0086], [0087], [0090], [0107]. As above. * [Y] 34-40, 42, 44, 45 and 54-56; | [XY]WO2012048043 (OCERA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-33, 41, 43, 46-53 and 57 * See [0003], [0005], [0102], [0103], [0113], [0114], [0117]. As above. * [Y] 34-40, 42, 44, 45 and 54-56; | [XY]AU2014250643 (OCERA THERAPEUTICS INC, et al) [X] 1-57 * See abstract, [0005], [0033], [0034], [0043], [0061], [0071], [0086], [0087], [0090], [0107]. As above. * [Y] 34-40, 42, 44, 45 and 54-56; | [PX]AU2015221466 (OCERA THERAPEUTICS INC) [PX] 1-57* See [0034], [0035], [0092], [0102], [0103], [0106], [0151], [0157], [0158]. *; | [A] - VENTURA-COTS, M. et al., "Safety of ornithine phenylacetate in cirrhotic decompensated patients: an open-label, dose-escalating, single-cohort study", Journal of Clinical Gastroenterology., (20130000), vol. 47, no. 10, pages 881 - 887, XP009507196 [A] 28-33 * See abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MCG.0b013e318299c789 | [A] - JALAN, R. et al., "L-Ornithine phenylacetate (OP): a novel treatment for hyperammonemia and hepatic encephalopathy", Medical Hypotheses., (20070000), vol. 69, no. 5, pages 1064 - 1069, XP 029096478 [A] 28-33 * See abstract, Figure 5. * | [A] - JOVER-COBOS, M. et al., "Ornithine phenylacetate revisited", Metabolic Brain Disease., (20130000), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 327 - 331, XP 055324717 [A] 28-33 * See abstract, subheading 'Clinical Studies'. * | Examination | - M. MOKHTARANI ET AL, "Urinary phenylacetylglutamine as dosing biomarker for patients with urea cycle disorders", MOLECULAR GENETICS AND METABOLISM, (20121101), vol. 107, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.ymgme.2012.08.006, ISSN 1096-7192, pages 308 - 314, XP055202395 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymgme.2012.08.006 | by applicant | WO8705297 | US2008119554 | WO2010115055 | US2010280119 | US2013211135 | - BATSHAW, M. L. et al., "Alternative pathway therapy for urea cycle disorders: twenty years later", J. Pediatr., (20010000), vol. 138, doi:10.1067/mpd.2001.111836, pages S46 - S55, XP002623143 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/mpd.2001.111836 | - ROCKEY D. et al., "Randomized, Double-Blind, Controlled Study of Glycerol Phenylbutyrate in Hepatic Encephalopathy", Hepatology, (20140000), vol. 59, no. 3, pages 1073 - 1083 | - JALAN et al., "L-Ornithine phenylacetate (OP): a novel treatment for hyperammonemia and hepatic encephalopathy", Med Hypotheses, (20070000), vol. 69, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.mehy.2006.12.061, pages 1064 - 69, XP029096478 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mehy.2006.12.061 |