EP3365310 - A GRANULAR FERTILIZER OR SOIL CONDITIONER AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioA Oy Kyminlinnantie 6 48600 Kotka / FI | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄRVINEN, Jari Nuotanperä 18 45160 Kouvola / FI | 02 /
VIRTANEN, Pasi J. Paloasemantie 19 53200 Lappeenranta / FI | 03 /
MUSTONEN, Kati Kalervonkatu 56 as 2 53100 Lappeenranta / FI | [2018/44] |
Former [2018/35] | 01 /
JÄRVINEN, Jari Nuotanperä 18 45160 Kouvola / FI | ||
02 /
VIRTANEN, Pasi J. Paloasemantie 19 53200 Lappeenranta / FI | |||
03 /
MUSTONEN, Kati Paloasemantie 19 53200 Lappeenranta / FI | Representative(s) | Genip Oy Heikinkatu 7 48100 Kotka / FI | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16784496.8 | 20.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016EP75224 | Priority number, date | FI20150005758 | 23.10.2015 Original published format: FI 20155758 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017068039 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365310 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C05C1/00, C05C3/00, C05D9/00, C05F5/00, C05F7/00, C05F9/00, C05G3/00 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
C05C1/02 (EP,US);
C05G5/30 (EP,FI,US);
C05C3/005 (EP,US);
C05C9/00 (EP,US);
C05D9/00 (EP,US);
C05F5/002 (EP,US);
C05F5/004 (EP,US);
C05F7/00 (EP,US);
C05F9/00 (EP,US);
C05G3/80 (EP,US);
C09K17/40 (FI);
Y02A40/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | DÜNGERGRANULAT ODER BODENKONDITIONIERER UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2018/35] | English: | A GRANULAR FERTILIZER OR SOIL CONDITIONER AND ITS USE | [2018/35] | French: | ENGRAIS OU CONDITIONNEUR DE SOL GRANULAIRE ET SON UTILISATION | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 20.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/12] | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3598563 (BURCH WENDELL D) [X] 1-5,7-19 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 65; examples I, II; claims 1-5 * * the whole document * [I] 6; | [A]US4571254 (WAHLBERG ARVO [FI]) [A] 1-19 * column 1, lines 14-67 * * claims 1-12 * * the whole document *; | [A]US2006243010 (SANDERS JOHN L [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0011] ** the whole document *; | [Y]US2008223098 (TAULBEE DARRELL N [US]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0012] - [0013]; examples 1-6; claims 1-29 * * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2014047793 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 2, line 5 - page 4, line 23; examples 1-3; claims 10-12 * * the whole document * | by applicant | US3408169 | US3618162 | EP0395354 | US6361720 | EP1579766 | WO2014044945 |