EP3356368 - BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLE CARRYING BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLYL GROUPS, CARBAZOLYL GROUPS, BENZOFURANE GROUPS OR BENZOTHIOPHENE GROUPS FOR ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DIODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd 2-1, Otemachi 1 Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [2021/27] |
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFER, Thomas Weidweg 15D 4410 Liestal / CH | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Masahiro 1280 Kami-izumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 03 /
NAGASHIMA, Hideaki Hochbergerstrasse 74 4057 Basel / CH | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Hollah, Dorothee Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2021/29] |
Former [2018/32] | Hollah, Dorothee Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 16784570.0 | 30.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016IB55870 | Priority number, date | EP20150187949 | 01.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15187949 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017056053 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3356368 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3356368 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C09K11/06, H01L51/00, H01L51/50 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
H10K85/654 (US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1014 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1018 (US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1037 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1044 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1059 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1088 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1092 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,US);
H10K2101/10 (US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K50/15 (EP,US);
H10K50/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | C07D487/04, C09K11/06, H01L51/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOL MIT BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLYLGRUPPEN, CARBAZOLYLGRUPPEN, BENZOFURANGRUPPEN ODER BENZOTHIOPHENGRUPPEN FÜR ORGANISCHE LEUCHTDIODEN | [2021/03] | English: | BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLE CARRYING BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLYL GROUPS, CARBAZOLYL GROUPS, BENZOFURANE GROUPS OR BENZOTHIOPHENE GROUPS FOR ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DIODES | [2018/32] | French: | GROUPES BENZIMIDAZOLO [1,2-A] BENZIMIDAZOLES PORTANT DES BENZIMIDAZOLO [1,2-A] BENZIMIDAZOLYLES, GROUPES CARBAZOLYLES, GROUPES BENZOFURANES OU BENZOTHIOPHÈNES POUR DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES ORGANIQUES | [2021/03] |
Former [2018/32] | BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOL MIT BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLYL-GRUPPEN, CARBAZOLYLGRUPPEN, BENZOFURANGRUPPEN ODER BENZOTHIOPHENGRUPPEN FÜR ORGANISCHE LEUCHTDIODEN | ||
Former [2018/32] | GROUPES BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLYLE, GROUPES CARBAZOLYLE, GROUPES BENZOFURANNE OU GROUPES BENZOTHIOPHÈNE PORTANT UN COMPOSÉ BENZIMIDAZOLO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLE POUR DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES ORGANIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 17.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2016 | AL | 21.07.2021 | AT | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | ES | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | IT | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | MT | 21.07.2021 | NL | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | FR | 30.09.2021 | IE | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | LU | 30.09.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | GB | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.09.2016 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
MK | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
GB | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.09.2016 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
GB | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
GB | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
GB | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
GB | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
GB | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2014009317 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [ID]WO2014044722 (BASF SE [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO0070655 | EP1097981 | WO0141512 | US2001015432 | US2001019782 | WO0202714 | WO0215645 | US2002024293 | EP1191612 | EP1191613 | US2002048689 | US2002055014 | EP1211257 | US2002094453 | WO02060910 | US6687266 | US6921915 | WO2005113704 | US2006008670 | WO2006014599 | WO2006056418 | WO2006067074 | WO2006073054 | WO2006098460 | WO2006100298 | WO2006115301 | WO2006121811 | WO2006128800 | EP1786050 | JP2007123392 | WO2007077810 | US2007190359 | WO2007095118 | EP1837927 | WO2007108459 | WO2007108362 | US2007224446 | WO2007114244 | WO2007119816 | US2007278938 | JP2008021687 | EP1885818 | WO2008020265 | WO2008029729 | WO2008029652 | JP2008066569 | WO2008035571 | WO2008034758 | JP2008074939 | JP2008084913 | EP1837926 | US2008106190 | JP2008127326 | WO2008072596 | WO2008090912 | WO2008101842 | JP2008207520 | EP1970371 | US2008265216 | EP1988587 | WO2008140114 | WO2008146838 | WO2008156879 | WO2008156105 | WO2009003898 | WO2009003919 | WO2009008100 | WO2009008099 | JP2009021336 | US2009039776 | JP2009059767 | WO2009050281 | WO2009050290 | WO2009060742 | WO2009060757 | WO2009060780 | WO2009060779 | WO2009063757 | US2009134784 | JP2009114369 | JP2009114370 | WO2009073245 | JP2009135183 | US2009153034 | WO2009086028 | WO2009084413 | JP2009170764 | JP2009182298 | WO2009100991 | WO2009104488 | JP2009267255 | US2009284138 | WO2010002850 | WO2010001830 | WO2010004877 | JP2010021336 | JP2010040830 | WO2010024404 | WO2010027583 | WO2010028151 | WO2010040777 | WO2010044342 | EP2180029 | US2010102709 | WO2010056669 | JP2010114180 | WO2010068876 | JP2010135467 | WO2010067746 | WO2010079051 | WO2010079678 | WO2010086089 | WO2010087222 | WO2010090077 | WO2010095564 | WO2010118029 | EP2246862 | WO2010129323 | WO2010132236 | US2011057559 | WO2011051404 | WO2011073149 | US2011163302 | WO2011090535 | WO2011106344 | US2011210316 | WO2011109042 | US2011227049 | US2011233528 | WO2011137072 | WO2011157779 | WO2011157790 | WO2011160757 | EP2401254 | WO2012008881 | WO2012014621 | WO2012016601 | WO2012048266 | WO2012053627 | US2012112176 | WO2012086170 | WO2012099219 | WO2012105310 | WO2012108388 | WO2012108389 | WO2012111462 | WO2012115034 | US2012223295 | WO2012121936 | WO2012130709 | US2012261654 | WO2012147397 | US2012292600 | US2012305894 | WO2012166608 | WO2012170571 | WO2012170461 | WO2012170463 | WO2012172482 | EP2551933 | WO2013022419 | WO2013085243 | US2013234119 | WO2013172255 | WO2013191177 | US2014001446 | US2014008633 | WO2014009317 | US2014048784 | WO2014044722 | US2014231794 | US2014367667 | WO2015014791 | WO2015115744 | EP20120175635 | EP20120185230 | EP20120191408 | EP20130191100 | WO2014EP64054 | WO2014EP66272 | EP20140180422 | EP20140197947 | EP20140197952 |