EP3304201 - IMPROVED STEREOLITHOGRAPHY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Castanon, Diego 1606 - 7325 Arcola Street Burnaby, British Columbia V5E 3C5 / CA | For all designated states Fortier, Raymond 4912 Hart Highway Prince George, British Columbia V2K 3A1 / CA | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTANON, Diego 1606 - 7325 Arcola Street Burnaby, British Columbia V5E 3C5 / CA | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 16785702.8 | 17.03.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016CA50299 | Priority number, date | US201562155246P | 30.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562155246 P | WO2015CA50860 | 04.09.2015 Original published format: PCT/CA2015/050860 | US201662275175P | 05.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662275175 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016172788 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3304201 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, B33Y30/00, B82Y30/00, B29C64/255, B29C64/124, B29C64/129, G03F7/00, B29K105/00, B33Y40/00, B29C64/20, // H01L51/50 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
B33Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/129 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/124 (EP,US);
B29C64/245 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/255 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/264 (KR);
B33Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y70/10 (KR);
G03F7/0037 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70416 (KR);
B29K2105/0058 (KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | G03F7/00, B33Y30/00, B82Y30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES STEREOLITHOGRAFISCHES SYSTEM | [2018/15] | English: | IMPROVED STEREOLITHOGRAPHY SYSTEM | [2018/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STÉRÉOLITHOGRAPHIE AMÉLIORÉ | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 05.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | 05.10.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 05.10.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5122441 (LAWTON JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 49 * * column 9, line 47 - column 10, line 28 * * column 17, line 26 - line 32 * * column 20, line 35 - line 41 * [Y] 6,10,13-15 [I] 3,9; | [Y]EP0616881 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 10 * abstract * * claims 1,3,4 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2002153640 (JOHN HENDRIK [DE]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * figures 1c,3b,3c,5a * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * claims 10-12 *; | [Y]US2004159967 (FARNWORTH WARREN M [US]) [Y] 14,15 * figure 4 ** paragraph [0076] *; | [Y]CN103722745 (UNIV BEIJING TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 13 * abstract * * figure 1 * | International search | [X]CA2898098 (CARBON3D INC [US]) [X] 1-36 *whole document*; | [X]CA2898103 (CARBON3D INC [US]) [X] 1-36 *whole document*; | [X]CA2898106 (CARBON3D INC [US]) [X] 1-36*whole document* |