EP3290224 - BOOKBINDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gradco Japan Ltd. Tennozu Yusen Building 5F 2-2-20, Higashi-shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUNARI, Kazushige c/o Gradco R&D Ltd. Tennozu Yusen Bldg. 5F 2-2-20 Higashi-shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16786559.1 | 28.04.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016JP63346 | Priority number, date | JP20150092612 | 30.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015092612 | JP20160003757 | 12.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016003757 | [2018/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016175283 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290224 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B42C19/02, B42C19/08, B65H37/04 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
B42C19/02 (EP,KR,US);
B42C1/12 (EP,US);
B42C19/08 (KR,US);
B65H37/04 (KR,US);
B65H2301/516 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BUCHBINDESYSTEM | [2018/10] | English: | BOOKBINDING SYSTEM | [2018/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RELIURE | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2017 | Translation filed | 30.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 30.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2015048197 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0013], [0044], [0049]; fig. 1, 8 & CN 104418152 A * [Y] 3-7; | [XY]JP2003091116 (CANON KK) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0013] to [0017]; fig. 1, 4 & US 2003/0053817 A1 & EP 1293841 A2 & CN 1405669 A * [Y] 3-7; | [Y]JP2008132725 (TOPPAN FORMS CO LTD) [Y] 3-4 * , paragraph [0034] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014141022 (RISO KAGAKU CORP) [Y] 5-7 * , paragraph [0081]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009132046 (DUPLO CORP) [Y] 7 * , paragraph [0026]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * |