EP3288568 - SECRETORY TNT CAR CELL IMMUNOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Southern California 1150 South Olive Street, Suite 2300 Los Angeles, CA 90015 / US | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EPSTEIN, Alan L. c/o University of Southern California 1150 South Olive Street Suite 2300 Los Angeles, California 90015 / US | 02 /
KASLOW, Harvey c/o University of Southern California 1150 South Olive Street Suite 2300 Los Angeles, California 90015 / US | 03 /
HU, Peisheng c/o University of Southern California 1150 South Olive Street Suite 2300 Los Angeles, California 90015 / US | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16787271.2 | 29.04.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016US30248 | Priority number, date | US201562155296P | 30.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562155296 P | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016176639 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3288568 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/17, A61K39/395, C12N15/00 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K35/76 (EP,US);
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
A61K38/193 (EP,US);
A61K38/195 (EP,US);
A61K38/20 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K38/208 (EP,US);
A61K38/2086 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4631 (EP);
A61K39/464412 (EP);
A61K39/464438 (EP);
A61K39/464452 (EP);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07K14/4748 (US);
C07K14/521 (US);
C07K14/535 (US);
C07K14/54 (US);
C07K14/5434 (US);
C07K14/5443 (US);
C07K14/55 (US);
C07K14/7051 (US);
C07K14/70517 (US);
C07K14/70521 (US);
C07K14/70532 (US);
C07K14/70575 (US);
C07K14/70578 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (US);
A61K2039/5256 (US);
A61K2039/572 (US);
A61K35/761 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/53 (US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
C07K2319/30 (US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,US);
C07K2319/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Title | German: | SEKRETORISCHE TNT-CAR-ZELLIMMUNTHERAPIE | [2018/10] | English: | SECRETORY TNT CAR CELL IMMUNOTHERAPY | [2018/10] | French: | IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE PAR CELLULES CAR TNT SÉCRÉTOIRES | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 02.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 03.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013287748 (JUNE CARL H [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 0017, paragraph 0019 * * paragraph [0301] - paragraph [0302] *; | [Y] - MILLER G K ET AL, "Immunologic and biochemical analysis of TNT-1 and TNT-2 monoclonal antibody binding to histones", HYBRIDOMA, LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19931201), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 0272-457X, pages 689 - 698, XP002119491 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [Y] - HORNICK J L ET AL, "A new chemically modified chimeric TNT-3 monoclonal antibody directed against DNA for the radioimmunotherapy of solid tumors", CANCER BIOTHERAPY AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, LIEBERT, US, (19980101), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 255 - 268, XP002119496 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [Y] - KHAWLI L A ET AL, "NHS76/PEP2, a fully human vasopermeability-enhancing agent to increase the uptake and efficacy of cancer chemotherapy", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20050101), vol. 11, no. 8, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-2310, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 3084 - 3093, XP003016188 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * First full paragraph; page 3085 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-2310 | International search | [Y]US6827925 (WILLIAMS ANDREW JAMES [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4, 101, 102 * . Especially col 1 ln 66 continued to col 2 ln 12; col 2 ln 15-19, col 2 ln 20-26, col 3 ln 66 continued to col 4 ln 11 *; | [Y]US2013287748 (JUNE CARL H [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 101, 102 * . Especially para [0008], [0090] *; | [A] - MILLER et al., "Immunologic and biochemical analysis of TNT-1 and TNT-2 monoclonal antibody binding to histones.", Hybridoma, (19931200), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 689 - 698, XP002119491 [A] 1-4 * . Especially abstract. * |