EP3291759 - DENTAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Of Melbourne Victoria 3010 / AU | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAZELAKIS, Efthimios c/o The University of Melbourne Melbourne, Victoria 3010 / AU | 02 /
PALAMARA, Joseph c/o The University of Melbourne Melbourne, Victoria 3010 / AU | 03 /
JUDGE, Roy c/o The University of Melbourne Melbourne, Victoria 3010 / AU | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16788970.8 | 06.05.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016AU50339 | Priority number, date | AU20150901651 | 07.05.2015 Original published format: AU 2015901651 | AU20160900901 | 10.03.2016 Original published format: AU 2016900901 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016176744 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3291759 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3291759 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61B17/06, A61F2/28, A61F2/30 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
A61C8/0018 (EP,US);
A61C8/0009 (US);
A61B17/06166 (US);
A61C8/001 (US);
A61C8/0022 (US);
A61C8/0066 (EP,US);
A61C8/0068 (EP,US);
A61C8/0071 (EP,US);
A61C8/0075 (EP,US);
A61C8/0078 (EP,US);
A61F2/2803 (US);
A61C2008/0046 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30116 (US);
A61F2002/30261 (US);
A61F2002/30405 (US);
A61F2002/30807 (US);
A61F2002/30828 (US);
A61F2002/30891 (US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | A61C8/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAHNIMPLANTAT | [2018/11] | English: | DENTAL IMPLANT | [2018/11] | French: | IMPLANT DENTAIRE | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 06.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2016 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | NL | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | TR | 24.06.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.05.2016 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MK | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 06.05.2016 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 06.05.2016 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0361526 (LINKOW LEONARD I) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 23, 25 * [A] 3 [Y] 6; | [X]WO2004064664 (PARISE GIANCARLO [IT]) [X] 1,11 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 21a, 21b *; | [XAY]US7695280 (YAZIGI ERNEST M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-13 * figures 7-10, 16 * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 6, lines 45-64 * * column 8, lines 59-67 * [A] 3-5,7,8,14,15 [Y] 6; | [X]WO2011069978 (VERCELLOTTI TOMASO [IT], et al) [X] 1,11 * page 1, line 5 ** figures 2-4 * | International search | [X]EP0361526 (LINKOW LEONARD I) [X] 1-21 * Figs 4, 5, 7, 23-25, 31; coln 6, lines 15-26, coln 7, lines 20-47, coln 8, lines 12-19, coln 9, lines 56-58 coln 14, lines 4-55 *; | [X]WO9743978 (SOFAMOR DANEK PROPERTIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1, 4, 19* Figs 1, 3, 7; Abstract, Page 4-6, 12 *; | [X]WO2004064664 (PARISE GIANCARLO [IT]) [X] 1-21 * Figs 1-5, 19, 21; Pages 1,2, 21-23, 25 *; | [X]WO2004082504 (CAGENIX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * Figs 1- 26D; Para [0044], [0049], [0100]-[0111] *; | [X]US2005042288 (KOBLISH ANTONY [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 19 * Figs 6A-6B; Para: [0163], [0164], [0172] *; | [X]WO2011069978 (VERCELLOTTI TOMASO [IT], et al) [X] 1-21 * Figs 1-4; Abstract; Page 1, Ins 15-19, page 3, Ins 23-29, page 4, Ins 4-27 * | by applicant | EP0361526 | WO2004064664 | US7695280 | WO2011069978 |