EP3292084 - NITRATE REMOVAL BY ION EXCHANGE AND BIOREGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technion Research & Development Foundation Ltd. Senate House Technion City 3200004 Haifa / IL | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Michal 37 Shvedia street Denia 3491290 Haifa / IL | 02 /
TARRE, Sheldon Kibbutz Yagur 3006500 Kibbutz Yagur / IL | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16789413.8 | 03.05.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016IL50459 | Priority number, date | GB20150007823 | 07.05.2015 Original published format: GB 201507823 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016178218 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3292084 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 10.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/78, C02F1/58, C02F1/42, C02F9/00, B01J49/00 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
A61L2/186 (US);
A61L2/26 (US);
B01D15/1864 (EP,US);
B01D15/203 (EP,US);
B01D15/361 (EP,US);
B01J41/05 (EP,US);
B01J41/20 (US);
B01J47/011 (EP,US);
B01J47/02 (US);
B01J47/022 (EP,US);
B01J49/07 (EP,US);
B01J49/57 (EP,US);
B01J49/60 (EP,US);
B01J49/75 (US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C02F3/282 (EP,US);
C02F1/722 (EP,US);
C02F2001/422 (EP,US);
C02F2101/163 (EP,US);
C02F2209/005 (EP,US);
C02F2209/04 (US);
C02F2209/05 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Title | German: | NITRATENTFERNUNG DURCH IONENAUSTAUSCH UND BIOREGENERATION | [2018/11] | English: | NITRATE REMOVAL BY ION EXCHANGE AND BIOREGENERATION | [2018/11] | French: | ÉLIMINATION DE NITRATES PAR ÉCHANGE D'IONS ET BIORÉGÉNÉRATION | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 06.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/02] | 08.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2018 | 12.09.2019 | 04   M04   Fee paid on   26.11.2019 | 31.05.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]FR2867182 (LYONNAISE EAUX FRANCE [FR]) [I] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 5, line 15 - page 8, line 16 *; | [I]US7407581 (BATISTA JACIMARIA R [US]) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2010041041 (CRANFIELD UNIVERSTIY [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I] - Jan Peter Van Der Hoek ET AL, "Combined ion exchange/biological denitrification for nitrate removal from ground water under different process conditions", Water Research, doi:10.1016/0043-1354(88)90178-9, (19880101), pages 679 - 684, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/0043135488901789, (20190912), XP055621466 [I] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 680, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0043-1354(88)90178-9 | International search | [X]US6066257 (VENKATESH K RAMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * whole document *; | [X]CN104445808 (INST APPLIED ECOLOGY CAS) [X] 1-37 * whole document (Espacenet machine translation) *; | [X] - S. GENO LEHMAN et al., "Perchlorate and nitrate treatment by ion exchange integrated with biological brine treatment", Water Research, vol. 42, no. 4-5, (20080000), pages 969 - 976, (20070921), XP022482381 [X] 1-37 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.watres.2007.09.011 | [X] - DENNIS CLIFFORD et al., "lon Exchange for Nitrate Removal", Journal American Water Works Association, vol. 85, no. 4, (19930400), pages 135 - 143, (19930430), XP055326450 [X] 1-37 |