EP3292687 - INTRA PREDICTION PROCESSOR WITH REDUCED COST BLOCK PARTITIONING AND REFINED INTRA MODE SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xilinx, Inc. 2100 Logic Drive San Jose, California 95124 / US | [2020/08] |
Former [2018/11] | For all designated states NGCodec Inc. 440 North Wolfe Road Mail Slot 159 Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UGUR, Kemal Akasya Sokak Mashattan Konutlari A3/55 Maslak / TR | 02 /
DUENAS, Alberto 950 High School Way Apt. 3207 Mountian View, CA 94041 / US | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16789771.9 | 27.04.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016US29595 | Priority number, date | US201562157916P | 06.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562157916 P | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016178880 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3292687 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N11/02, H04N19/11, H04N19/119, H04N19/147, H04N19/149, H04N19/176, H04N19/19, H04N19/96 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
H04N19/11 (EP,US);
H04N19/119 (EP,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/19 (EP,US);
H04N19/96 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | H04N11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Title | German: | INTRAPRÄDIKTIONSPROZESSOR MIT REDUZIERTER KOSTENBLOCKPARTITIONIERUNG UND VERFEINERTER INTRAMODUSAUSWAHL | [2018/11] | English: | INTRA PREDICTION PROCESSOR WITH REDUCED COST BLOCK PARTITIONING AND REFINED INTRA MODE SELECTION | [2018/11] | French: | PROCESSEUR D'INTRA PRÉDICTION AVEC PARTITIONNEMENT DE BLOCS À COÛT RÉDUIT ET SÉLECTION PERFECTIONNÉE DE MODES INTRA | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 05.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2018 | 30.04.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - CHO SEUNGHYUN ET AL, "Fast CU Splitting and Pruning for Suboptimal CU Partitioning in HEVC Intra Coding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, US, vol. 23, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2013.2249017, ISSN 1051-8215, (20130901), pages 1555 - 1564, (20130830), XP011525604 [X] 1,4,10-14 * page 1556, paragraph III - page 1557; table I * [Y] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2013.2249017 | [XA] - SAURTY K ET AL, "Early CU size determination in HEVC intra prediction using Average Pixel Cost", 2014 FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY AND ITS APPLICATIONS (DICTAP), IEEE, (20140506), doi:10.1109/DICTAP.2014.6821690, pages 247 - 252, XP032598490 [X] 1,4,10-14 * page 248, paragraph II - paragraph III * [A] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DICTAP.2014.6821690 | [XA] - LIANG ZHAO ET AL, "Fast mode decision algorithm for intra prediction in HEVC", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING (VCIP), 2011 IEEE, IEEE, (20111106), doi:10.1109/VCIP.2011.6115979, ISBN 978-1-4577-1321-7, pages 1 - 4, XP032081373 [X] 1,4,10-14 * the whole document * [A] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VCIP.2011.6115979 | [YA] - OHM J-R ED - OHM JENS-RAINER, Multimedia Communication Technology. 11. Quantization and Coding, Passage, MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY : REPRESENTATION, TRANSMISSION AND IDENTIFICATION OF MULTIMEDIA SIGNALS; [SIGNALS AND COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY], SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, PAGE(S) 445 - 508, (20040101), ISBN 978-3-540-01249-8, XP002492448 [Y] 2 * abstract * * pages 445-451, paragraph 11.1 - paragraph 11.2.1 * [A] 1,3,4,10-13 | [YA] - KWAN-JUNG OH ET AL, Adaptive Rate-Distortion Optimization for H.264, ADVANCES IN MULITMEDIA INFORMATION PROCESSING - PCM 2005 LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 617 - 628, (20050101), ISBN 978-3-540-30040-3, XP019024087 [Y] 3 * pages 618-620, paragraph 2.1 - paragraph 2.2 * [A] 1,2,4,10-14 | [A] - PIAO Y ET AL, "Encoder improvement of unified intra prediction", 3. JCT-VC MEETING; 94. MPEG MEETING; 7-10-2010 - 15-10-2010; GUANGZHOU; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20101002), no. JCTVC-C207, XP030007914 [A] 1-4,10-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2012183064 (LIU WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire document *; | [X]US2012287995 (BUDAGAVI MADHUKAR [US]) [X] 1-16 * , entire document especially paras [0019], [0031], [0034], [0041], [0042], [0043], [0057] *; | [A]US2013136174 (XU LIDONG [CN], et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire document *; | [A]US2013188703 (LIU LINGZHI [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire document *; | [A]US2014092983 (JOSHI RAJAN LAXMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-16* , entire document * |