EP3369051 - INTEGRATED HEALTHCARE PERFORMANCE ASSESSMENT TOOL FOCUSED ON AN EPISODE OF CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEODORO, Douglas Henrique c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ROTGANS, Niels Roman c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
OLIVEIRA, Lucas de Melo c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
ELGORT, Daniel Robert c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Niessen, Arnoldus Jeroen Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16790719.5 | 25.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016IB56393 | Priority number, date | US201562248479P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248479 P | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017072651 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369051 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/22 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06393 (US);
G06Q10/067 (US);
G06Q10/10 (US);
G06Q30/0205 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES INSTRUMENT ZUR LEISTUNGSBEURTEILUNG IM GESUNDHEITSWESEN MIT FOKUS AUF EINE VERSORGUNGSEPISODE | [2018/36] | English: | INTEGRATED HEALTHCARE PERFORMANCE ASSESSMENT TOOL FOCUSED ON AN EPISODE OF CARE | [2018/36] | French: | OUTIL D'ÉVALUATION DE PERFORMANCES DE SOINS DE SANTÉ INTÉGRÉ FOCALISÉ SUR UN ÉPISODE DE SOINS | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 17.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 03.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.05.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO03107250 (MOORE GORDON T [US]) [I] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005216831 (GUZIK GRZEGORZ [US], et al) [I] 1-25* the whole document *; | [I]US2012035945 (JAIN NIKHIL [US], et al) [I] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [I]US2015248529 (CHEN JAMES J [US]) [I] 1-25 * the whole document * |