EP3365887 - DISPLAY WITH LIGHT-EMITTING DIODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Chin-Wei 1 Infinite Loop M/S 89-2PPO Cupertino CA 95014 / US | 02 /
LIN, Hung Sheng 1 Infinite Loop M/S 83-I Cupertino CA 95014 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Shih-Chang 1 Infinite Loop M/S 89-2PPO Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16790797.1 | 17.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US57296 | Priority number, date | US201562263074P | 04.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562263074 P | US201615263803 | 13.09.2016 Original published format: US201615263803 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017095537 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365887 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3233 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3266 (KR,US);
G09G3/3275 (KR,US);
H01L27/1225 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/78651 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7869 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/0202 (US);
G09G2310/0256 (EP);
G09G2320/0295 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/043 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | ANZEIGE MIT LICHTEMITTIERENDEN DIODEN | [2018/35] | English: | DISPLAY WITH LIGHT-EMITTING DIODES | [2018/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 23.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Divisional application(s) | EP19214406.1 / EP3706108 | EP23187572.5 / EP4254393 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2010220117 (KIMURA HAJIME [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 2B * [A] 15,20; | [A]CN204167325U (APPLE INC) [A] 2-4,15,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015109279 (GUPTA VASUDHA [US], et al) [A] 2-4,15,20 * paragraph [0047] *; | [XA]US2015213757 (TAKAHAMA KENGO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0004] , [0040] , [0041] , [0066] , [0127] - [0129] - [0334] - [0356]; figures 1,2,46 * [A] 3-8,15-20; | [XA]US2015248856 (KISHI NORITAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [A] 2; | [P]US2016087022 (TSAI TSUNG-TING [TW], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0026] - [0027]; figures 1-2 * |