EP3374216 - AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUG, Joachim Michael La-Motte-Servolex-Str. 16/1 74395 Mundelsheim / DE | [2019/34] |
Former [2018/38] | 01 /
HAUG, Joachim Michael Kilianstrasse 29 74395 Mundelsheim / DE | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 16791029.8 | 04.11.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016EP76736 | Priority number, date | DE201510222267 | 11.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015222267 | [2018/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017080932 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3374216 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3374216 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, F25D17/02 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
B60H1/00385 (EP,US);
B60H1/004 (US);
B60H1/00028 (US);
B60H1/00042 (US);
B60H1/00899 (EP,US);
B60H1/32284 (EP);
F25B25/005 (EP,US);
F25B29/003 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00961 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE | [2018/38] | English: | AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM | [2018/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 19.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2016 | AL | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | ES | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | IT | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | NL | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | TR | 21.08.2019 | IE | 04.11.2019 | LU | 04.11.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | FR | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.11.2016 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.11.2016 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2013023631 (IXETIC BAD HOMBURG GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* page 29, lines 9-25; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102013006356 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0043]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102014205030 (MAHLE BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |