EP3365527 - QUICK COUPLING WITH VOLUME DISPLACEMENT PASSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker-Hannifin Corporation 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44124 / US | [2019/44] |
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states Parker Hannifin Corporation 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, OH 44124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICK, Leonard 4001 Hickory Court Rockford, Minnesota 55373 / US | 02 /
MARQUIS, Timothy 6448 Marlowe Avenue NE Otsego, Minnesota 55301 / US | 03 /
LEMAY, Paul 4130 Victoria Street North Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | 04 /
KOLLER, Jason 16056 Sheldon Ave. Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55344 / US | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Orr, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Orr, Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16791134.6 | 05.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US55430 | Priority number, date | US201562244931P | 22.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562244931 P | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017069949 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365527 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3365527 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/037, F16L1/26, F16L37/30 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
F16L57/005 (EP,US);
E21B17/02 (EP,US);
F16L55/115 (EP,US);
F16L37/33 (US);
Y10T137/87957 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLVERBINDUNG MIT VOLUMENVERDRÄNGUNGSKANAL | [2018/35] | English: | QUICK COUPLING WITH VOLUME DISPLACEMENT PASSAGE | [2018/35] | French: | RACCORD RAPIDE AVEC PASSAGE À DÉPLACEMENT VOLUMIQUE | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 05.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2016 | AL | 04.12.2019 | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | IT | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.10.2016 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US6394131 (FROSS ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,21,22 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 44; figure - * [A] 4,12,14-16 [I] 2,3,5-11,13,17-20; | [A]US2002174990 (SMITH ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0013]; figure - *; | [A]DE102008017053 (NAT COUPLING CO INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]DE102009024899 (NAT COUPLING CO INC [US]) [A] 1-22* figure - *; | [A]DE102013223047 (NAT COUPLING CO INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * |