EP3375027 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN ANODE FOR A LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, THE ANODE, A LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING THE ANODE AND USES THEREOF. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/38] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ANODE FOR A LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, ANODE PRODUCED, LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY CONTAINING THE ANODE, AND USES THEREOF | ||
[2018/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden 01069 Dresden / DE | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIWKO, Markus Gabelentzstraße 4 04603 Windischleuba / DE | 02 /
HÄRTEL, Paul Bautzner Straße 15 01099 Dresden / DE | 03 /
ALTHUES, Holger Bergmannstraße 29 01309 Dresden / DE | 04 /
KASKEL, Stefan Hainichener Straße 26 01159 Dresden / DE | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 16791419.1 | 08.11.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016EP76931 | Priority number, date | DE201510222048 | 10.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015222048 | [2018/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017080978 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3375027 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3375027 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/04, H01M4/38, H01M4/58, H01M10/052 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
H01M4/386 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M4/0421 (EP);
H01M4/5815 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ANODE FÜR EINE LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, HERGESTELLTE ANODE, LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE ENTHALTEND DIE ANODE UND VERWENDUNGEN HIERVON | [2018/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN ANODE FOR A LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, THE ANODE, A LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING THE ANODE AND USES THEREOF. | [2018/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D 'UNE ANODE POUR UNE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, L' ANODE, UNE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM COMPRENANT L 'ANODE ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ANODE FOR A LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, ANODE PRODUCED, LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY CONTAINING THE ANODE, AND USES THEREOF | ||
Former [2018/38] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ANODE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, ANODE PRODUITE, BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM CONTENANT L'ANODE ET UTILISATIONS DE CELLE-CI | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 08.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2016 | AL | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | ES | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | IT | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | NL | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SE | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | IE | 08.11.2019 | LU | 08.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2013052532 (KIM WON-BAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15,17,18 * paragraphs [0007] , [0043] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0060] , [0061] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0009]; figure 5a * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0049] , [0055] * * paragraph [0006] * [Y] 6,14,16 [I] 14; | [Y]US2015004485 (CHEN ZHAOHUI [US], et al) [Y] 16 * paragraphs [0035] , [0066] *; | [Y]DE102013216259 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [YD] - DU, Z. ET AL., "Improved electrochemical performance of nanostructured Si-based films modified by chemical etching", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, (2012), vol. 74, pages 222 - 226, XP028509159 [YD] 14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2012.04.052 | by applicant | - DU, Z. ET AL., ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, (2012), vol. 74, pages 222 - 226 | - FARMAKIS, F. ET AL., JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (2015), vol. 293, pages 301 - 305 |