EP3371602 - A METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING ANTI-TNF ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promise Proteomics 7 Parvis Louis Néel Bht 52A CS 20050 38040 Grenoble cedex 9 / FR | [2019/36] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Promise Advanced Proteomics 7 Parvis Louis Neel CS20050 38040 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBERT, Dorothée 32 chemin des olagnères 38450 Le Gua / FR | 02 /
PICARD, Guillaume 90 chemin de Culaz 74130 Mont-Saxonnex / FR | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16791588.3 | 04.11.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016EP76739 | Priority number, date | WO2015EP306759 | 06.11.2015 Original published format: PCT/EP2015/306759 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017077080 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371602 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3371602 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/6848 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON ANTI-TNF-ANTIKÖRPERN | [2018/37] | English: | A METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING ANTI-TNF ANTIBODIES | [2018/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE QUANTIFICATION D'ANTICORPS ANTI-TNF | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 18.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2016 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | IE | 04.11.2019 | LU | 04.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.11.2016 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.11.2016 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 04.11.2016 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006131013 (ESBATECH AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2011056590 (PROMETHEUS LAB INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A] - Bendtzen K and Svenson M, "Enzyme Immunoassays and Radioimmunoassays for Quantification of Anti-TNF Biopharmaceuticals and Anti-Drug Antibodies", Bendtzen K and Svenson M, Tovey MG, Detection and Quantification of Antibodies to biopharmaceuticals: Practical and Applied Considerations, John Wiley and Sons Inc, (20110620), pages 82 - 101, III, doi:10.1002/9781118075685.ch5, ISBN 9781118075685, XP002754673 [A] 1-15 * p 86, paras 5.3.1. and 5.3.1.1. * |