EP3294873 - TARGETING BCL11A ENHANCER FUNCTIONAL REGIONS FOR FETAL HEMOGLOBIN REINDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | New entry: Payment of appeal fee following opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Children's Medical Center Corporation 55 Shattuck Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | For all designated states The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/37] | For all designated states The Children's Medical Center Corporation 55 Shattuck Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | ||
For all designated states The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states The Children's Medical Center Corporation 55 Shattuck Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | ||
For all designated states The Broad Institute Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Daniel E. 61 Foster Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | 02 /
ORKIN, Stuart H. 120 Seaver Street Brookline, Massachusetts 02442 / US | 03 /
SANJANA, Neville Apt 16L 4 Washington Square Village New York, New York 10012 / US | 04 /
SHALEM, Ophir 205 Edgehill Rd. Merion Station, PA 19066 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Feng Apartment 11 100 Pacific St. Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2018/23] |
Former [2018/12] | 01 /
BAUER, Daniel E. 61 Foster Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | ||
02 /
ORKIN, Stuart H. 120 Seaver Street Brookline, Massachusetts 02442 / US | |||
03 /
SANJANA, Neville Apt 16L 4 Washington Square Village New York, New York 10012 / US | |||
04 /
SHALEM, Ophir 435, 435 Gooding Way Albany, California 94706 / US | |||
05 /
ZHANG, Feng Apartment 11 100 Pacific St. Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Sweetinburgh, Mark Roger, et al Sweetinburgh & Windsor 3 Amberley Court Whitworth Road Crawley, West Sussex RH11 7XL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16793259.9 | 06.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016US31224 | Priority number, date | US201562158882P | 08.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562158882 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016182917 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294873 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3294873 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12N5/078, C12N9/22, C12N15/11, C12N15/86 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
C12N5/0641 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/113 (EP);
C12N15/86 (US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/12] | C12N5/0789, C12N5/10, C12N5/095 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABZIELUNG AUF FUNKTIONELLE REGIONEN DES BCL11A-ENHANCERS ZUR REINDUKTION VON FETALEM HÄMOGLOBIN | [2018/12] | English: | TARGETING BCL11A ENHANCER FUNCTIONAL REGIONS FOR FETAL HEMOGLOBIN REINDUCTION | [2018/12] | French: | CIBLAGE DES RÉGIONS FONCTIONNELLES DE L'ACTIVATEUR DE BCL11A POUR LA RÉINDUCTION DE L'HÉMOGLOBINE FOETALE | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 07.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20185077.3 / EP3763814 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.2021
24.05.2021
ADMISSIBLE JG Oppositions Limited Floor 15 The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Mathys & Squire, et al, et al The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/26] | 04.06.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.12.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.11.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2023 | 30.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.01.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | Appeal following opposition | 22.03.2024 | Appeal received No. T0445/24 | 22.03.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2016 | AL | 19.08.2020 | AT | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | CZ | 19.08.2020 | DK | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | FI | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | NL | 19.08.2020 | PL | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SE | 19.08.2020 | SI | 19.08.2020 | SK | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | NO | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | IS | 19.12.2020 | PT | 21.12.2020 | IE | 06.05.2021 | LU | 06.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 06.05.2016 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 19.08.2020 | |
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015065964 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,9,13-16 * the whole document *; | [YD] - T. WANG ET AL, "Genetic Screens in Human Cells Using the CRISPR-Cas9 System", SCIENCE, (20131212), vol. 343, no. 6166, doi:10.1126/science.1246981, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 80 - 84, XP055115509 [YD] 3-5,9,13-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1246981 | [ ] - T. WANG ET AL, "Supplementary Material: Genetic Screens in Human Cells Using the CRISPR-Cas9 System", SCIENCE, US, (20131212), vol. 343, no. 6166, doi:10.1126/science.1246981, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 80 - 84, XP055294787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1246981 | [YD] - JOHN G DOENCH ET AL, "Rational design of highly active sgRNAs for CRISPR-Cas9-mediated gene inactivation", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20140903), vol. 32, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nbt.3026, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1262 - 1267, XP055190845 [YD] 3-5,9,13-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3026 | [ ] - JOHN G DOENCH ET AL, "Supplementary material: Rational design of highly active sgRNAs for CRISPR-Cas9-mediated gene inactivation", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, US, (20140903), vol. 32, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nbt.3026, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1262 - 1267, XP055294825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3026 | [XY] - D. E. BAUER ET AL, "Supplementary Material: An Erythroid Enhancer of BCL11A Subject to Genetic Variation Determines Fetal Hemoglobin Level", SCIENCE, US, (20131011), vol. 342, no. 6155, doi:10.1126/science.1242088, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1 - 39, XP055497414 [X] 1,2,6-8,10-12 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5,9,13-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1242088 | [A] - SEBASTIANI P ET AL, "BCL11Aenhancer haplotypes and fetal hemoglobin in sickle cell anemia", BLOOD CELLS, MOLECULES AND DISEASES, (20150130), vol. 54, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BCMD.2015.01.001, ISSN 1079-9796, pages 224 - 230, XP029201175 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcmd.2015.01.001 | [XP] - CARMEN F BJURSTRÖM ET AL, "Reactivating Fetal Hemoglobin Expression in Human Adult Erythroblasts Through BCL11A Knockdown Using Targeted Endonucleases", MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, (20160101), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/mtna.2016.52, ISSN 2162-2531, page e351, XP055497327 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mtna.2016.52 | [XP] - MATTHEW C. CANVER ET AL, "BCL11A enhancer dissection by Cas9-mediated in situ saturating mutagenesis", NATURE, United Kingdom, (20150916), vol. 527, no. 7577, doi:10.1038/nature15521, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 192 - 197, XP055274680 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature15521 | International search | [A]WO2012073047 (GENOME RES LTD [GB], et al) [A] 22, 23/22* ; entire document *; | [X]WO2014085593 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [X] 22, 23/22 * ; paragraphs [0010], [0011], [0020]; claim 1, claim 2 *; | [A] - BAUER, D et al., "An Erythroid Enhancer Of BCL11A Subject To Genetic Variation Determines Fetal Hemoglobin Level.", Science, (20130906), vol. 342, no. 6155, pages 253 - 257, XP005520375 [A] 22, 23/22 * ; entire document. DOI: 10.1126/science.1243745 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-6995(97)80020-4 | Examination | US2015132269 | WO2017115268 | WO2017182881 | - "BCL11A gene editing gRNA spacer, SEQ ID 6657.", Geneseq, (20171130), Database accession no. BEJ64224, URL: EBI | - "Chromosome-11 French HPFH region sgRNA targeting RNA domain, SEQ ID 1690.", Geneseq, (20170824), Database accession no. BEC40217, URL: EBI | - "Human BCL11A enhancer region (+55 region) fragment, SEQ ID 175.", Geneseq, (20151231), Database accession no. BCH28316, URL: EBI | by applicant | US8021867 | US8119381 | US8124369 | US8129134 | US8133697 | US8143015 | US8143016 | US8148098 | US8163514 | US8304222 | - OLIVIERI, Seminars in Hematology, (19960000), vol. 33, pages 24 - 42 | - MCCARTHY et al., Nat Rev Genet, (20080000), vol. 9, page 356 | - MANOLIO, J Clin Invest, (20080000), vol. 118, page 1590 | - LIU et al., Nat Immunol, (20030000), vol. 4, page 525 | - LETTRE et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (20080000), vol. 105, page 1620 | - MENZEL et al., Nat Genet, (20070000), vol. 39, page 1197 | - LIU et al., Mol Cancer, (20060000), vol. 5, page 18 | - G. STAMATOYANNOPOULOS, Exp Hematol, (20050000), vol. 33, page 259 | - CHEVALIER et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20010000), vol. 29, no. 18, pages 3757 - 3774 | - CERTO, MT et al., Nature Methods, (20120000), vol. 9, pages 073 - 975 | - BANERJI, J.RUSCONI, S.SCHAFFNER, W., "Expression of a beta-globin gene is enhanced by remote SV40 DNA sequences", Cell, (19810000), vol. 27, doi:10.1016/0092-8674(81)90413-X, pages 299 - 308, XP023912786 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(81)90413-X | - VISEL, A. et al., "ChIP-seq accurately predicts tissue-specific activity of enhancers", Nature, (20090000), vol. 457, doi:10.1038/nature07730, pages 854 - 858, XP055308081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature07730 | - THURMAN, R. E. et al., "The accessible chromatin landscape of the human genome", Nature, (20120000), vol. 489, doi:10.1038/nature11232, pages 75 - 82, XP055269699 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11232 | - DUNHAM, I. et al., "An integrated encyclopedia of DNA elements in the human genome", Nature, (20120000), vol. 489, doi:10.1038/nature11247, pages 57 - 74, XP055045368 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11247 | - JOHNSON, D. S.MORTAZAVI, A.MYERS, R. M., "Genome-Wide Mapping of in Vivo Protein-DNA Interactions", Science, (20070000), vol. 316, pages 1497 - 1503 | - BARSKI, A. et al., "High-Resolution Profiling of Histone Methylations in the Human Genome", Cell, (20070000), vol. 129, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2007.05.009, pages 823 - 837, XP002517421 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2007.05.009 | - ANDERSSON, R. et al., "An atlas of active enhancers across human cell types and tissues", Nature, (20140000), vol. 507, doi:10.1038/nature12787, pages 455 - 61, XP055538672 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature12787 | - CONSORTIUM, R. E. et al., "Integrative analysis of 111 reference human epigenomes", Nature, (20150000), vol. 518, page 7539 | - HEINTZMAN, N. D. et al., "Histone modifications at human enhancers reflect global cell-type-specific gene expression", Nature, (20090000), vol. 459, doi:10.1038/nature07829, pages 108 - 112, XP055308084 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature07829 | - CREYGHTON, M. P. et al., "Histone H3K27ac separates active from poised enhancers and predicts developmental state", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U. S. A., (20100000), vol. 107, doi:10.1073/pnas.1016071107, pages 21931 - 21936, XP055074651 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1016071107 | - RADA-IGLESIAS, A. et al., "A unique chromatin signature uncovers early developmental enhancers in humans", Nature, (20110000), vol. 470, doi:10.1038/nature09692, pages 279 - 283, XP055308006 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09692 | - XU, J. et al., "Combinatorial assembly of developmental stage-specific enhancers controls gene expression programs during human erythropoiesis", Dev. Cell, (20120000), vol. 23, doi:10.1016/j.devcel.2012.09.003, pages 796 - 811, XP028948737 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.devcel.2012.09.003 | - ERNST, J. et al., "Mapping and analysis of chromatin state dynamics in nine human cell types", Nature, (20110000), vol. 473, doi:10.1038/nature09906, pages 43 - 49, XP055311128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09906 | - PARKER, S. C. J. et al., "Chromatin stretch enhancer states drive cell-specific gene regulation and harbor human disease risk variants", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U. S. A., (20130000), vol. 110, pages 17921 - 6 | - WHYTE, W. A. et al., "Master transcription factors and mediator establish super-enhancers at key cell identity genes", Cell, (20130000), vol. 153, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.03.035, pages 307 - 319, XP028547941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.03.035 | - PAUL, D. S. et al., "Maps of open chromatin guide the functional follow-up of genome-wide association signals: Application to hematological traits", PLoS Genet, (20110000), vol. 7 | - MAURANO, M. T. et al., "Systematic localization of common disease-associated variation in regulatory DNA", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 1190 - 1195 | - HNISZ, D. et al., "Super-enhancers in the control of cell identity and disease", Cell, (20130000), vol. 155, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.09.053, pages 934 - 47, XP055498823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.09.053 | - HARDISON, R. C., "Variable evolutionary signatures at the heart of enhancers", Nat. Genet., (20100000), vol. 42, pages 734 - 735 | - BLOW, M. J. et al., "ChIP-Seq identification of weakly conserved heart enhancers", Nat. Genet., (20100000), vol. 42, doi:10.1038/ng.650, pages 806 - 810, XP055306894 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.650 | - MAY, D. et al., "Large-scale discovery of enhancers from human heart tissue", Nat. Genet., (20110000), vol. 44, pages 89 - 93 | - VIERSTRA, J. et al., "Mouse regulatory DNA landscapes reveal global principles of cis-regulatory evolution", Science, (20140000), vol. 346, pages 1007 - 1012 | - VILLAR, D. et al., "Enhancer Evolution across 20 Mammalian Species", Cell, (20150000), vol. 160, pages 554 - 566 | - PENNACCHIO, L. et al., "In vivo enhancer analysis of human conserved non-coding sequences", Nature, (20060000), vol. 444, pages 499 - 502 | - MELNIKOV, A. et al., "Systematic dissection and optimization of inducible enhancers in human cells using a massively parallel reporter assay", Nat. Biotechnol., (20120000), vol. 30, doi:10.1038/nbt.2137, pages 271 - 277, XP055143175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2137 | - PATWARDHAN, R. P. et al., "Massively parallel functional dissection of mammalian enhancers in vivo", Nat. Biotechnol., (20120000), vol. 30, doi:10.1038/NBT.2136, pages 265 - 270, XP002685091 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.2136 | - LIEBERMAN-AIDEN, E. et al., "Comprehensive Mapping of Long-Range Interactions Reveals Folding Principles of the Human Genome", Science, (20090000), vol. 326, pages 289 - 294 | - DIXON, J. R. et al., "Topological domains in mammalian genomes identified by analysis of chromatin interactions", Nature, (20120000), vol. 485, doi:10.1038/nature11082, pages 376 - 380, XP055178389 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11082 | - NORD, A. S. et al., "Rapid and pervasive changes in genome-wide enhancer usage during mammalian development", Cell, (20130000), vol. 155, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.11.033, pages 1521 - 1531, XP028806604 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.11.033 | - SEXTON, T.CAVALLI, G., "Review The Role of Chromosome Domains in Shaping the Functional Genome", Cell, (20150000), vol. 160, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2015.02.040, pages 1049 - 1059, XP029203798 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2015.02.040 | - BENDER, M.BULGER, M.CLOSE, J.GROUDINE, M., "Beta-globin gene switching and DNase I sensitivity of the endogenous beta-globin locus in mice do not require the locus control region", Mol. Cell, (20000000), vol. 5, pages 387 - 393 | - JOHNSON, K. D. et al., "is-element mutated in GATA2-dependent immunodeficiency governs hematopoiesis and vascular integrity", J. Clin. Invest., (20120000), vol. 122, pages 3692 - 3704 | - CONG, L. et al., "Multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR/Cas systems", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, pages 819 - 23, XP055458249 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | - MALI, P. et al., "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, doi:10.1126/science.1232033, pages 823 - 6, XP055469277 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | - WANG, T.WEI, J. J.SABATINI, D. M.LANDER, E. S., "Genetic screens in human cells using the CRISPR-Cas9 system", Science, (20140000), vol. 343, doi:10.1126/science.1246981, pages 80 - 4, XP055294787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1246981 | - SHALEM, O. et al., "Genome-scale CRISPR-Cas9 knockout screening in human cells", Science, (20140000), vol. 343, doi:10.1126/science.1247005, pages 84 - 7, XP055115506 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1247005 | - KOIKE-YUSA, H.LI, Y.TAN, E.-P.DEL CASTILLO VELASCO-HERRERA, M.YUSA, K., "Genome-wide recessive genetic screening in mammalian cells with a lentiviral CRISPR-guide RNA library", Nat. Biotechnol., pages 1 - 10 | - MATHELIER, A. et al., "JASPAR 2014: An extensively expanded and updated open-access database of transcription factor binding profiles", Nucleic Acids Res., (20140000), vol. 42, pages 142 - 147 | - CHEN, S. et al., "Genome-wide CRISPR Screen in a Mouse Model of Tumor Growth and Metastasis Resource Genome-wide CRISPR Screen in a Mouse Model of Tumor Growth and Metastasis", Cell, (20150000), vol. 160, pages 1 - 15 | - BAUER, D. E. et al., "An Erythroid Enhancer of BCL11A Subject to Genetic Variation Determines Fetal Hemoglobin Level", Science, (20130000), vol. 342, doi:10.1126/science.1242088, pages 253 - 257, XP055568654 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1242088 | - GROSCHEL, S. et al., "A single oncogenic enhancer rearrangement causes concomitant EVI1 and GATA2 deregulation in Leukemia", Cell, (20140000), vol. 157, pages 369 - 381 | - MANSOUR, M. R. et al., "An oncogenic super-enhancer formed through somatic mutation of a noncoding intergenic element", Science, (20140000), pages 10 - 15 | - SANKARAN, V. G. et al., "Human fetal hemoglobin expression is regulated by the developmental stage-specific repressor BCL11A", Science, (20080000), vol. 322, doi:10.1126/science.1165409, pages 1839 - 1842, XP055568754 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1165409 | - SANKARAN, V. G. et al., "Developmental and species-divergent globin switching are driven by BCL11A", Nature, (20090000), vol. 460, doi:10.1038/nature08243, pages 1093 - 1097, XP055260135 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08243 | - XU, J. et al., "Correction of sickle cell disease in adult mice by interference with fetal hemoglobin silencing", Science, (20110000), vol. 334, doi:10.1126/science.1211053, pages 993 - 996, XP055568725 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1211053 | - HARDISON, R. C.BLOBEL, G. A., "GWAS to therapy by genome edits?", Science, (20130000), vol. 342, pages 206 - 7 | - KURITA, R. et al., "Establishment of Immortalized Human Erythroid Progenitor Cell Lines Able to Produce Enucleated Red Blood Cells", PLoS One, (20130000), vol. 8, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0059890, page e59890, XP055488499 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0059890 | - CANVER, M. C. et al., "Characterization of Genomic Deletion Efficiency Mediated by Clusted Regularly Interspaced Palindromic Repeats (CRISPR)/Cas9 Nuclease System in Mammalian Cells", J. Biol. Chem., (20140000), vol. 289, pages 21312 - 21324 | - MANDAL, P. K. et al., "Efficient Ablation of Genes in Human Hematopoietic Stem and Effector Cells using CRISPR/Cas9", Cell Stem Cell, (20140000), vol. 15, doi:10.1016/j.stem.2014.10.004, pages 643 - 652, XP055560200 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2014.10.004 | - RAN, F. A. et al., "Double nicking by RNA-guided CRISPR Cas9 for enhanced genome editing specificity", Cell, (20130000), vol. 154, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.08.021, pages 1380 - 9, XP055299681 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.08.021 | - HSU, P. D. et al., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA-guided Cas9 nucleases", Nat. Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 31, doi:10.1038/nbt.2647, pages 827 - 32, XP055219426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647 | - CUI, F.SIROTIN, M. VZHURKIN, V. B., "Impact of Alu repeats on the evolution of human p53 binding sites", Biol. Direct, (20110000), vol. 6, doi:10.1186/1745-6150-6-2, page 2, XP021090028 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1745-6150-6-2 | - PORCU, B. S. et al., "The human β globin locus introduced by YAC transfer exhibits a specific and reproducible pattern of developmental regulation in transgenic mice", Blood, (19970000), vol. 90, pages 4602 - 4609 | - LIU, P. et al., "Bell la is essential for normal lymphoid development", Nat. Immunol., (20030000), vol. 4, doi:10.1038/ni925, pages 525 - 532, XP055017589 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni925 | - JOHN, A. et al., "Bell la is required for neuronal morphogenesis and sensory circuit formation in dorsal spinal cord development", Development, (20120000), vol. 139, pages 1831 - 41 | - YU, Y. et al., "Bell la is essential for lymphoid development and negatively regulates p53", J. Exp. Med., (20120000), vol. 209, pages 2467 - 83 | - CROCKER, J. et al., "Low Affinity Binding Site Clusters Confer Hox Specificity and Regulatory Robustness", Cell, (20150000), pages 191 - 203 | - BAUER, D. E.ORKIN, S. H., "Update on fetal hemoglobin gene regulation in hemoglobinopathies", Curr. Opin. Pediatr., (20110000), vol. 23, doi:10.1097/MOP.0b013e3283420fd0, pages 1 - 8, XP055259213 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MOP.0b013e3283420fd0 | - BAUER, D. E.KAMRAN, S. C.ORKIN, S. H., "Reawakening fetal hemoglobin: Prospects for new therapies for the beta-globin disorders", Blood, (20120000), vol. 120, doi:10.1182/blood-2012-06-292078, pages 2945 - 2953, XP002721961 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2012-06-292078 | - SANKARAN, V. G.ORKIN, S. H., "The switch from fetal to adult hemoglobin", Cold Spring Harb. Perspect. Med., (20130000), vol. 3, pages 1 - 14 | - BAUER, D. E. E.KAMRAN, S. C. C.ORKIN, S. H. H., "Reawakening fetal hemoglobin: prospects for new therapies for the (3-globin disorders", Blood, (20120000), vol. 120, doi:10.1182/blood-2012-06-292078, pages 2945 - 2953, XP002721961 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2012-06-292078 | - SANJANA, N. E.SHALEM, O.ZHANG, F., "Improved vectors and genome-wide libraries for CRISPR screening", Nat. Methods, (20140000), vol. 11, doi:10.1038/nmeth.3047, pages 783 - 784, XP055611279 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.3047 | - GIARRATANA, M. et al., "Proof of principle for transfusion of in vitro generated red blood cells", Blood, (20110000), vol. 118, doi:10.1182/blood-2011-06-362038, pages 5071 - 5079, XP055258936 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2011-06-362038 | - BRINKMAN, E. K.CHEN, T.AMENDOLA, M.VAN STEENSEL, B., "Easy quantitative assessment of genome editing by sequence trace decomposition", Nucleic Acids Res., (20140000), pages 1 - 8 | - BAUER, D. E.CANVER, M. C.ORKIN, S. H., "Generation of Genomic Deletions in Mammalian Cell Lines via CRISPR/Cas9", J. Vis. Exp., (20140000), doi:10.3791/52118, pages 1 - 10, XP055494719 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3791/52118 | - CANVER, M. C. et al., "Characterization of Genomic Deletion Efficiency Mediated by CRISPR/Cas9 in Mammalian Cells", J. Biol. Chem., (20140000), vol. 289, pages 21312 - 21324 | - KOWALCZYK, M. S. et al., "Intragenic Enhancers Act as Alternative Promoters", Mol. Cell, (20120000), vol. 45, doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2011.12.021, pages 447 - 458, XP028905698 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2011.12.021 | - GRANT, C. E.BAILEY, T. L.NOBLE, W. S., "FIMO: Scanning for occurrences of a given motif", Bioinformatics, (20110000), vol. 27, pages 1017 - 1018 | - WEBER, K.BARTSCH, U.STOCKING, C.FEHSE, B., "A multicolor panel of novel lentiviral 'gene ontology' (LeGO) vectors for functional gene analysis", Mol. Ther., (20080000), vol. 16, pages 698 - 706 | - DOENCH, J. G. et al., "Rational design of highly active sgRNAs for CRISPR-Cas9-mediated gene inactivation", Nat Biotechnol, (20140000), vol. 32, doi:10.1038/nbt.3026, XP055539784 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3026 | - GILBERT, L. A et al., "CRISPR-Mediated Modular RNA-Guided Regulation of Transcription in Eukaryotes", Cell, (20130000), vol. 154, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044, pages 442 - 451, XP055115843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044 | - KLEINSTIVER, B. P. et al., "Engineered CRISPR-Cas9 Nucleases with Altered PAM Specificities", Nature, (20150000), vol. 523, no. 7561, doi:10.1038/nature14592, pages 481 - 85, XP055293257 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14592 | Opposition | WO2014085593 | WO2014186585 | - Matthew C. Canver, Elenoe C. Smith, Falak Sher, Luca Pinello, Neville E. Sanjana, Ophir Shalem, Diane D. Chen, Patrick G. Schupp, Divya S. Vinjamur, Sara P. Garcia, Sidinh Luc, Ryo Kurita, Yukio Nakamura, Yuko Fujiwara, Takahiro Maeda, Guo-Cheng Yuan, Feng Zhang, Stuart H. Orkin, Daniel E. Bauer, "BCL11A enhancer dissection by Cas9-mediated in situ saturating mutagenesis", Nature, Nature Publishing Group UK, London, London, (20151112), vol. 527, doi:10.1038/nature15521, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 192 - 197, XP055274680 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature15521 | - Orkin Stuart h., "2014 William Allan Award: A Hematologist’s Pursuit of Hemoglobin Genetics1", The American Journal of Human Genetics, American society of human genetics , Chicago , IL, US, US , (20150305), vol. 96, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.ajhg.2014.12.007, ISSN 0002-9297, pages 354 - 360, XP055955128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajhg.2014.12.007 | - Ran F Ann, Hsu Patrick D, Wright Jason, Agarwala Vineeta, Scott David A, Zhang Feng, "Genome engineering using the CRISPR-Cas9 system /HHS Author Manuscript/", Nature Protocols, Nature Publishing Group, GB, GB , (20140330), doi:10.1038/nprot.2013.143, ISSN 1754-2189, pages 1 - 49, XP055955129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2013.143 | - D. E. Bauer, S. C. Kamran, S. Lessard, J. Xu, Y. Fujiwara, C. Lin, Z. Shao, M. C. Canver, E. C. Smith, L. Pinello, P. J. Sabo, J. Vierstra, R. A. Voit, G.-C. Yuan, M. H. Porteus, J. A. Stamatoyannopoulos, G. Lettre, S. H. Orkin, "An Erythroid Enhancer of BCL11A Subject to Genetic Variation Determines Fetal Hemoglobin Level", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, (20131011), vol. 342, no. 6155, doi:10.1126/science.1242088, ISSN 00368075, pages 253 - 257, XP055203754 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1242088 | - Hwang Gue-Ho, Yu Jihyeon, Yang Soyeon, Son Woo Jae, Lim Kayeong, Kim Heon Seok, Kim Jin-Soo, Bae Sangsu, "CRISPR-sub: Analysis of DNA substitution mutations caused by CRISPR-Cas9 in human cells", COMPUTATIONAL AND STRUCTURAL BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, Research Network of Computational and Structural Biotechnology, Sweden, Sweden , (20200101), vol. 18, doi:10.1016/j.csbj.2020.06.026, ISSN 2001-0370, pages 1686 - 1694, XP055923680 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.csbj.2020.06.026 | - V. G. Sankaran, S. H. Orkin, "The Switch from Fetal to Adult Hemoglobin", Cold Spring Harbor Perspectives in Medicine, (20130101), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1101/cshperspect.a011643, pages a011643-1 - a011643-14, XP055341053 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/cshperspect.a011643 | - Gordon D. Ginder, "Epigenetic regulation of fetal globin gene expression in adult erythroid cells", Translational Research, (20150101), vol. 165, no. 1, pages 115 - 125, XP055955130 | - Roberto Gambari, Alessia Finotti, Laura Breda, Carsten Lederer, Nicoletta Bianchi, Cristina Zuccato, Marina Klenathous, Stefano Rivella, "Recent trends in the gene therapy of β-thalassemia", Journal of Blood Medicine, (2015), doi:10.2147/JBM.S46256, pages 69 - 85, XP055482908 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/JBM.S46256 | - Andreas Reik, 1 Kai-Hsin Chang,2 Jeff Vierstra,2 Nikoletta Psatha,2 Sandra Stehling-Sun,2 Yuanyue Zhou,1 Colleen M. O’neil,1 Andrea Mich,1 Jeffrey C. Miller,1 Gary Lee,1 Siyuan Tan,3 Haiyan Jiang,3 George Stamatoyannopoulos,2 Thalia Papayannopoulou,2 Edward J. Rebar,1 Philip D. Gregory,1 John A. Stamatoyannopoulos,2 Fyodor D. Urnov, "53. From GWAS To the Clinic: Genome-Editing the Human BCL11A Erythroid Enhancer for Fetal Globin Elevation in the Hemoglobinopathies", Molecular Therapy, (20150501), vol. 23, no. Suppl. 1, pages S23 - S24, XP055955133 | - Bauer Daniel E.; Kamran Sophia C.; Lessard Samuel; Xu Jian; Fujiwara Yuko; Lin Carrie; Shao Zhen; Canver Matthew C.; Smith Elenoe C.; Pinello Luca; Sabo Peter J.; Vierstra Jeff; Voit Richard A.; Yuan Guo-Cheng; Porteus Matthew H.; Stamatoyannopoulos John; Lettre Guillaume; Orkin Stuart H., "Fine-Mapping and Genome Editing Reveal An Essential Erythroid Enhancer At The HbF-Associated BCL11A Locus", Blood, American Society of Hematology, US, US , (20131115), vol. 122, no. 21, doi:10.1182/blood.V122.21.437.437, ISSN 0006-4971, page 437, XP086749940 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V122.21.437.437 | - Anonymous, "Addgene: CRISPR in the Lab: A Practical Guide", Internet Archive Wayback Machine, (20150504), pages 1 - 6, Internet Archive Wayback Machine , URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150504075703/https://www.addgene.org/CRISPR/guide/, (20220825), XP055955135 | - Ryo Kurita, Noriko Suda, Kazuhiro Sudo, Kenichi Miharada, Takashi Hiroyama, Hiroyuki Miyoshi, Kenzaburo Tani, Yukio Nakamura, "Establishment of Immortalized Human Erythroid Progenitor Cell Lines Able to Produce Enucleated Red Blood Cells", PLoS ONE, (201303), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0059890, page e59890, XP055488499 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0059890 | - Anonymous, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES DIRECTED TO HUMAN FETAL HEMOGLOBIN (HbF)", Life Technologies Corporation, (20130101), page 34pp, Life Technologies Corporation, URL: http://tools.thermofisher.com/content/sfs/manuals/L13011_ms_x_huHbF_mab_man.pdf, (20220825), XP055955136 | - John G Doench, Ella Hartenian, Daniel B Graham, Zuzana Tothova, Mudra Hegde, Ian Smith, Meagan Sullender, Benjamin L Ebert, Ramnik J Xavier, David E Root, "Rational design of highly active sgRNAs for CRISPR-Cas9-mediated gene inactivation", Nature Biotechnology, Nature Publishing Group US, New York, New York, (20140903), vol. 32, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nbt.3026, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1262 - 1267, XP055190845 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3026 | - Gilbert Luke a., Horlbeck Max a., Adamson Britt, Villalta Jacqueline e., Chen Yuwen, Whitehead Evan h., Guimaraes Carla, Panning Barbara, Ploegh Hidde l., Bassik Michael c., Qi Lei s., Kampmann Martin, Weissman Jonathan s., "Genome-Scale CRISPR-Mediated Control of Gene Repression and Activation /NIH Public Manuscript/", Cell, Elsevier, Amsterdam NL, Amsterdam NL , (20151023), doi:10.1016/j.cell.2014.09.029, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 1 - 26, XP055955137 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.09.029 | - Shalem Ophir, Sanjana Neville E., Zhang Feng, "High-throughput functional genomics using CRISPR-Cas9 /HHS Author Manuscript/", NATURE REVIEWS GENETICS, Nature Publishing Group, GB, GB , (20151101), doi:10.1038/nrg3899, ISSN 1471-0056, pages 1 - 28, XP055955138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg3899 | - Anonymous, "Enhancer (genetics) - Wikipedia", (20150419), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Enhancer_(genetics)&oldid=657120611, (20220825), XP055955140 | - Olivia Corradin;Peter C Scacheri, "Enhancer variants: evaluating functions in common disease", GENOME MEDICINE, (20141028), vol. 6, no. 10, doi:10.1186/s13073-014-0085-3, ISSN 1756-994X, page 85, XP021208823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13073-014-0085-3 | - Hongmei Lisa Li; Takao Nakano; Akitsu Hotta, "Genetic correction using engineered nucleases for gene therapy applications", DEVELOPMENT GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION., Richmond, Vic. : Blackwell Publ. Asia, US, US , (20131211), vol. 56, no. 1, doi:10.1111/dgd.12107, ISSN 0012-1592, pages 63 - 77, XP071144200 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/dgd.12107 |