EP3365788 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANNOTATING CLIENT-SERVER TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CA, Inc. 1320 Ridder Park Drive San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2020/23] |
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states Symantec Corporation 350 Ellis Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RINEHART, Michael, D. 1390 Saddle Rack Street 3 San Jose, CA 95126 / US | 02 /
BUSHA, Michael, T. 991 University Dr. Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | 01 /
RINEHART, Michael, D. 1390 Saddle Rack Street 3 San Jose, CA 95126 / US | ||
02 /
BUSHA, Michael, T. 776 Live Oak Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 16794795.1 | 20.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US57918 | Priority number, date | US201562244994P | 22.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562244994 P | US201615186053 | 17.06.2016 Original published format: US201615186053 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017070349 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365788 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/30 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
G06F11/3006 (EP,US);
H04L67/561 (US);
G06F11/3072 (EP,US);
G06F11/3075 (EP,US);
G06F11/3438 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANNOTATION VON CLIENT-SERVER-TRANSAKTIONEN | [2018/35] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANNOTATING CLIENT-SERVER TRANSACTIONS | [2018/35] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANNOTATION DE TRANSACTIONS CLIENT-SERVEUR | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 21.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/14] | 01.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005103900 (GOOGLE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0084] *; | [A]EP2378426 (COMPUTER ASS THINK INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0088] *; | [XI]US2012005690 (HOUCK CHRISTOPHER RAYMOND [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,12,14-16,19 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0059] * [I] 3,4,6,10,11,13,17,18,20; | [A]US2015032884 (GREIFENEDER BERND [AT], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0110] *; | [A]US2015058681 (LINGANNAPETA SREEKANTH [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A] - RICHARD ATTERER ET AL, "Knowing the user's every move", WWW '06 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WORLD WIDE WEB, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20060523), doi:10.1145/1135777.1135811, ISBN 978-1-59593-323-2, pages 203 - 212, XP058095370 [A] 1-20 * page 204 - page 212 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1135777.1135811 |