EP3371171 - INHIBITORS OF RET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blueprint Medicines Corporation 45 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUBAKER, Jason, D. 26 Sciarappa Street Unit 1 Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | 02 /
KIM, Joseph, L. 20 Green Way Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 03 /
WILSON, Kevin, J. 38 Union Park Apt. 4 Boston, MA 02118 / US | 04 /
WILSON, Douglas 33 Mulberry Circle Ayer, MA 01432 / US | 05 /
DIPIETRO, Lucian, V. 37 Centennial Avenue Gloucester, MA 01930 / US | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Garner, Stephen, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/43] |
Former [2018/37] | Garner, Stephen, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16794885.0 | 01.11.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016US59879 | Priority number, date | US201562249784P | 02.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562249784 P | US201662367960P | 28.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662367960 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017079140 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371171 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3371171 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/14, A61P35/00, A61K31/53, A61K31/506, A61K31/4439 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (IL,KR);
A61K31/506 (IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C07D239/30 (EP,IL,US);
C07D239/34 (EP);
C07D239/36 (IL,US);
C07D239/38 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Validation states | MA | 31.05.2018 | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN VON RET | [2018/37] | English: | INHIBITORS OF RET | [2018/37] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE RET | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 31.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23201915.8 / EP4292594 | EP23201930.7 / EP4331585 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IS | 25.02.2024 | [2024/21] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004009087 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009003136 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2014130810 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 |