EP3371251 - FLAME RETARDANT MELT POLYCARBONATE GRADES ON LINE COMPOUNDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ CANOVAS, Maria Dolores c/Jose Javier nº 6 1º izq 30009 Murcia / ES | 02 /
VAN DE GRAMPEL, Robert Het Lint 19 4691 DK Tholen / NL | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16795165.6 | 04.11.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016IB56653 | Priority number, date | EP20150382551 | 06.11.2015 Original published format: EP 15382551 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017077500 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371251 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/00, C08J3/20, C08G64/30, C08L69/00, C08K5/00, C08K5/42 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
C08J3/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/201 (US);
C08G64/04 (US);
C08K3/016 (EP,US);
C08K5/0066 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/42 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/5415 (KR);
C08K5/5419 (US);
C08L69/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Title | German: | ONLINE-COMPOUNDIERUNG MIT FLAMMHEMMENDEN SCHMELZEPOLYCARBONATSTUFEN | [2018/37] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT MELT POLYCARBONATE GRADES ON LINE COMPOUNDING | [2018/37] | French: | QUALITÉS DE POLYCARBONATE FONDU IGNIFUGE SUR MALAXAGE EN LIGNE | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 14.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 15.05.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003214070 (GOOSSENS JOHANNES MARTINUS DIN [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,14-17,19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0007] , [0018] , [0025] , [0027] * * example 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]WO2014033508 (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL]) [X] 1,4,5,7,14,17,18,20 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0015] , [0037] , [0041] , [0045] , [0063] , [0064] , [0073] , [0082] * * paragraphs [0086] , [0097] * * figures 1, 2 ** claims 1-3, 16 *; | [X]US2015011688 (AN NARONG [CN], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-14,16-20 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0064] , [0077] , [0082] , [0099] , [0111] - [0113] - [0153] - [0155] * * paragraphs [0174] , [0192] - [0197] * * examples Com.1, Com. 2 * * claims 1, 9, 10, 14, 17-19, 24, 25-28 *; | [X]US2015099845 (DAGA VIKRAM K [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,13,14,19,20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] - [0009] - [0083] , [0212] , [0225] - [0228] * * Samples 1-5 * * claims 1, 9, 30, 32 *; | [X]EP2865699 (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL]) [X] 1,4,5,14,17,18 * paragraphs [0005] , [0018] , [0054] , [0055] , [0071] , [0074] *; | [X]EP2937371 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [X] 1,4,5,14,17,18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0020] , [0021] , [0043] , [0044] , [0060] , [0066] * * claim 1 * |