EP3313301 - ULTRASONIC TREATMENT DEVICES AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Paul 45 Lakeside Drive Smithfield, RI 02917 / US | 02 /
TONG, Ray 31 Twilight Drive Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 16795182.1 | 24.10.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US58412 | Priority number, date | US201562245532P | 23.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562245532 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017070650 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313301 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61B17/22 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/320068 (EP,US);
A61B17/2202 (EP,US);
A61N7/00 (US);
A61B1/00137 (EP,US);
A61B17/320092 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00199 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00287 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00296 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0034 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00402 (US);
A61B2017/00415 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLBEHANDLUNGSGERÄTE UND -SYSTEME | [2024/38] | English: | ULTRASONIC TREATMENT DEVICES AND SYSTEMS | [2018/18] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES DE TRAITEMENT PAR ULTRASONS | [2018/18] |
Former [2018/18] | ULTRASCHALLBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 25.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5349940 (TAKAHASHI ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]EP1510178 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]); | [A]US2005272976 (TANAKA SHINSUKE [JP], et al); | [XYI]US2007038157 (YAMADA NORIHIRO [JP], et al); | [XI]US2009216157 (YAMADA NORIHIRO [JP]); | [A]US2013144186 (FURLONG COSME [US]); | [A]US2014005701 (OLSON WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [A]US2014005702 (TIMM RICHARD W [US], et al) |