EP3374193 - PIGMENT SYSTEM, LUMINESCENT DYE SYSTEM, AND VALUE DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 161 81677 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2018/38] | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KECHT, Johann Beblostrasse 3 81677 München / DE | 02 /
SCHLOSSBAUER, Axel Schellingstrasse 73 80799 München / DE | 03 /
GIERING, Thomas Am Kleinfeld 12 85614 Kirchseeon / DE | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Giesecke+Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/02] | Giesecke + Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16795231.6 | 09.11.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016EP01863 | Priority number, date | DE20151014560 | 11.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015014560 | [2018/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017080654 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3374193 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3374193 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/38, C08G18/75, C08G18/79, C08K3/013, C08L61/28, C09D11/50, C09K11/06, C09B67/22, C09B67/08, C09B67/02, C09D11/037, B42D25/387, C08K5/00, C08L33/12, C08L75/02, C09K11/02, D21H21/40, G07D7/1205, G07D7/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
B42D25/387 (EP,US);
B42D25/355 (US);
B42D25/373 (US);
C08G18/3851 (EP,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K5/0041 (EP,US);
C08L33/12 (EP,US);
C08L61/28 (EP,US);
C08L75/02 (EP,US);
C09B67/0013 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (EP,US);
C09B67/0097 (EP,US);
C09D11/037 (EP,US);
C09D11/50 (EP,US);
C09K11/02 (EP,US);
C09K11/025 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
D21H21/30 (US);
D21H21/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L61/28, C08K3/012, C08L33/12 (US);
C08L61/28, C08K3/012, C08L75/02 (US);
C08L61/28, C08K3/013, C08L33/12 (US,EP);
C08L61/28, C08K3/013, C08L75/02 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2018/38] | B41M3/14, C09K11/06, C09D161/28, D21H21/30, G07D7/12, B42D25/30, B42D25/29, C09B67/22, C09B67/08, C09B67/02, C09D11/037, G01N21/64, B42D25/387 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIGMENTSYSTEM, LUMINESZENZFARBSYSTEM UND WERTDOKUMENT | [2018/38] | English: | PIGMENT SYSTEM, LUMINESCENT DYE SYSTEM, AND VALUE DOCUMENT | [2018/38] | French: | SYSTÈME PIGMENTAIRE, SYSTÈME DE COLORATION LUMINESCENT ET DOCUMENT DE VALEUR | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1826730 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-23 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0024] , [0036] ** claims 1-33 *; | [I]WO2008141972 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [I] 1-23 * page 2, lines 8-33 * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, lines 13, 29-32 * * page 6, lines 10-17 * * page 8, lines 16-31 * * page 9, lines 29-32 * * page 11, line 35 - page 12, lines 5, 23-28 * * claims 1, 2, 5-43 *; | [I]DE102012013244 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-23 * paragraphs [0007] , [0019] , [0020] * * claims 1-9 * |