EP3297670 - MOLECULAR CONSTRUCTS WITH TARGETING AND EFFECTOR ELEMENTS AND THEIR APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2020 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunwork Inc. 1F, No. 47, Sec. 2 Academia Road Nangang District Taipei City 115 / TW | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Tse-wen 1f., No.47. Sec. 2 Academia Road Nangang District Taipei 115 / TW | 02 /
CHU, Hsing-Mao 1f., No.47. Sec. 2 Academia Road Nangang District Taipei 115 / TW | 03 /
LIN, Chien-Jen 1f., No.47. Sec. 2 Academia Road Nangang District Taipei 115 / TW | 04 /
LIN, Chun-Yu 1f., No.47. Sec. 2 Academia Road Nangang District Taipei 115 / TW | 05 /
CHEN, Jou-Han 1f., No.47. Sec. 2 Academia Road Nangang District Taipei 115 / TW | 06 /
DU, Li-Yun 1f., No.47. Sec. 2 Academia Road Nangang District Taipei 115 / TW | 07 /
TIAN, Wei-Ting 1f., No.47. Sec. 2 Academia Road Nangang District Taipei 115 / TW | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Rosenheimer Straße 139 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16795913.9 | 20.05.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016CN82785 | Priority number, date | US201562164400P | 20.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562164400 P | US201562213012P | 01.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562213012 P | WO2016CN71184 | 18.01.2016 Original published format: PCT/CN2016/071184 | US201662308349P | 15.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662308349 P | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016184426 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3297670 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/46, C12P21/08, C07K14/565, C07K7/08, C07K16/18 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
C07K16/283 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K31/137 (IL,RU,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K47/64 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K47/65 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K47/6883 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL);
A61P31/12 (EP,IL);
C07K14/001 (IL,RU,US);
C07K14/565 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K16/1027 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K16/1203 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K16/2839 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K16/2881 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K17/02 (IL,RU,US);
C07K17/06 (IL,RU,US);
C07K7/08 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/35 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/64 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | A61K39/395, C07K16/46, C12P21/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | MOLEKULARE KONSTRUKTE MIT TARGETING- UND EFFEKTORELEMENTEN UND DEREN ANWENDUNGEN | [2018/13] | English: | MOLECULAR CONSTRUCTS WITH TARGETING AND EFFECTOR ELEMENTS AND THEIR APPLICATIONS | [2018/13] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS MOLÉCULAIRES À ÉLÉMENTS DE CIBLAGE ET EFFECTEURS ET LEURS APPLICATIONS | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 04.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007104789 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 29, line 1 - line 7 *; | [I]WO2011029008 (UNIV ARIZONA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 9, 7, 14 *; | [I]WO2011045668 (UNIV ALBERTA [CA], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 35, line 1 - page 36, line 26; figure 8 *; | [I]WO2012007896 (COVX TECHNOLOGIES IRELAND LTD [IE], et al) [I] 1-15 * examples 1-10 *; | [I]WO2013004607 (BAYER IP GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 74, line 15 - line 23 *; | [I]US2015030594 (YUAN JUN [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0182] *; | [E]WO2016112870 (CHANG TSE-WEN [CN], et al) [E] 1-15 * claims 1,6,12,9 *; | [I] - CHAUDHARY V K ET AL, "A RAPID METHOD OF CLONING FUNCTIONAL VARIABLE-REGION ANTIBODY GENESIN ESCHERICHIA COLI AS SINGLE-CHAIN IMMUNOTOXINS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,, (19900201), vol. 87, no. 3, doi:10.1073/PNAS.87.3.1066, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1066 - 1070, XP000095668 [I] 1-15 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.3.1066 | International search | [A]WO2008127642 (ENTERON LTD PARTNERSHIP [US], et al) [A] 1-94 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]WO2010093395 (IMMUNOMEDICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-94 * claims 1, 12-13 *; | [A]WO2011026026 (IMMUNOMEDICS INC [US], et al) [A] 95-110 * claims 1-45 *; | [A]WO2014153002 (CALIFORNIA INST BIOMEDICAL RES [US], et al) [A] 1-94 * claims 35-36, 43 *; | [X] - LI, WENLI et al., "New advances in bispecific antibodies for cancer therapy.", CHEMISTRY OF LIFE, (20101231), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 827 - 832, XP009504715 [X] 95-110 | [A] - CAO, GANG et al., "Antibody-Drug Conjugates.", PROGRESS IN CHEMISTRY, (20140225), vol. 26, no. 2/3, pages 467 - 477, XP055465696 [A] 1-110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7536/PC130650 | [A] - ZHU, GUIDONG et al., "Design of next generation antibody drug conjugates.", Acta Pharmaceutica Sinica, (20131231), vol. 48, no. 7, pages 1053 - 1070, XP009504713 [A] 1-110 | by applicant | US5858728 | US2007253958 |