EP3526666 - A METHOD FOR COMPOSING AN APPLICATION USING A PLURALITY OF DISTRIBUTED INTERACTION PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANICIC, Darko Tölzer Strasse 4 81739 München / DE | 02 /
THULUVA, Aparna Saisree Putzbrunnerstr. 121 81739 München / DE | [2019/35] |
Former [2019/34] | 01 /
ANICIC, Darko Tölzer Strasse 4 81739 München / DE | ||
02 /
THULUVA, Aparna, Saisree Reifenstuelstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 16797505.1 | 14.11.2016 | [2019/34] | WO2016EP77543 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018086711 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526666 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3526666 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/36 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
G06F8/36 (EP,US);
G06F8/35 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERSTELLEN EINER ANWENDUNG MIT MEHREREN VERTEILTEN INTERAKTIONSMUSTERN | [2019/34] | English: | A METHOD FOR COMPOSING AN APPLICATION USING A PLURALITY OF DISTRIBUTED INTERACTION PATTERNS | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMPOSITION D'UNE APPLICATION À L'AIDE D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE SCHÉMAS D'INTERACTION DISTRIBUÉS | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 24.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I] - SAFINA SHOWKAT ARA ET AL, "Web-of-Objects Based User-Centric Semantic Service Composition Methodology in the Internet of Things", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DISTRIBUTED SENSOR NETWORKS, (20140508), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.1155/2014/482873, ISSN 1550-1477, page 482873, XP055345668 [I] 1-7 * sections 3-4;; figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2014/482873 | [I] - Tomás Robles ET AL, "An IoT based reference architecture for smart water management processes", (20150131), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Ramon_Alcarria/publication/282307190_An_iot_based_reference_architecture_for_smart_water_management_processes/links/573d737c08aea45ee841b257.pdf, (20170214), XP055345419 [I] 1-7 * section 4;; figures 4, 9 * | [I] - MEYER SONJA ET AL, Internet of Things-Aware Process Modeling: Integrating IoT Devices as Business Process Resources, NETWORK AND PARALLEL COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CHAM, PAGE(S) 84 - 98, (20130617), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-642-16984-7, XP047036720 [I] 1-7 * sections 3-5;; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-38709-8_6 | Examination | - ARNE BRÖRING ET AL, "A Categorization of Discovery Technologies for the Internet of Things", THE INTERNET OF THINGS, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20161107), doi:10.1145/2991561.2991570, ISBN 978-1-4503-4814-0, pages 131 - 139, XP058306872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2991561.2991570 |