EP3355042 - DISPLAY SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY APPARATUS, PRESSURE DETECTION SYSTEM AND DETECTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Beijing BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 8 Xihuanzhonglu, BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Jiuxia No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
QIU, Yun No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Zhidong No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2018/31] | Gesthuysen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16797708.1 | 29.02.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016CN74816 | Priority number, date | CN201510617530 | 24.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510617530 | [2018/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017049872 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3355042 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3355042 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, G01L9/00 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
G01L9/0072 (EP,US);
G01L9/08 (US);
G01L9/12 (US);
H10K50/865 (US);
H10K59/00 (US);
H10K59/1213 (US);
H10K59/131 (US);
H10K59/38 (EP,US);
H10K59/8792 (EP);
G01L19/083 (EP,US);
H10K59/12 (US);
H10K59/1201 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | G01L9/12, G01L9/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, DRUCKERFASSUNGSSYSTEM UND DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/31] | English: | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY APPARATUS, PRESSURE DETECTION SYSTEM AND DETECTION METHOD THEREOF | [2018/31] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE, APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE, SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE PRESSION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2016 | Translation filed | 28.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2016 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 28.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | FR | 28.02.2023 | GB | 28.02.2023 | IE | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | LU | 28.02.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
FR | 28.02.2023 | ||
GB | 28.02.2023 | ||
IE | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
GB | 28.02.2023 | ||
IE | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008202251 (SERBAN BOGDAN [LU], et al) [X] 1,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,10,11; | [A]US2015041813 (KIM YOUNG-DO [KR], et al)[A] 2,3; | [XI]WO2015037197 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,10,11 | International search | [A]RU2324159 (FEDERAL NOE G UCHREZHDENIE ROS [RU]) [A] 1-18* , the whole document *; | [A]CN101680813 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN101978342 (SANG-YOUL HAN) [X] 1, 13-18 * , claim 1, and figure 1 *; | [A]CN103344377 (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN203365045U (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN104423748 (AU OPTRONICS CORP) [X] 1, 13-18 * , description, paragraphs [0026] and [0027], and figure 3 *; | [PX]CN105136378 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-18 * , description, paragraphs [0040]-[0103], and figures 1-11 *; | [PX]CN204988604U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-18 * , description, paragraphs [0038]-[0101], and figures 1-11 * |