EP3349941 - APPARATUS FOR MACHINING A COMPONENT AND METHOD OF MACHINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIESE, Andreas Kaiser-Friedrich-Str. 22 10585 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KLEMKE, Thomas Rapsstr. 25 13625 Berlin / DE | 03 /
PIASECKI, Pascal Wandelsweg 105 45894 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 04 /
GELLENTHIEN, Heiko Alboinstr. 25 12103 Berlin / DE | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 16797788.3 | 08.11.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016EP76943 | Priority number, date | EP20150200522 | 16.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15200522 | [2018/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017102180 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349941 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3349941 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/06, B25B1/24, B23Q3/10, B23Q1/01 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
B23Q3/063 (EP,US);
B23Q1/015 (EP);
B23Q3/104 (EP,US);
B25B1/2405 (EP,US);
B25B5/14 (EP,US);
B25B5/163 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/30] | B23Q3/06, B25B1/24, B23Q3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINER KOMPONENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG | [2018/30] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MACHINING A COMPONENT AND METHOD OF MACHINING | [2018/30] | French: | APPAREIL D'USINAGE D'UN COMPOSANT ET PROCÉDÉ D'USINAGE | [2021/22] |
Former [2018/30] | APPAREIL POUR USINER UN COMPOSANT ET PROCÉDÉ D'USINAGE | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 30.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed [2021/25] | 21.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2016 | AL | 05.01.2022 | AT | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | ES | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | NL | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SE | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | TR | 05.01.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 05.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2010170081 (KURODA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * paragraph [0082]; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 10; | [Y]DE4116979 (JOHANN SPREITZER WERKZEUG NORM [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * figures 2-3 *; | [I]DE102007049862 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-3,10-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] , [0025]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2005091846 (POWERS JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-3,10-12 * paragraph [0005]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1806477 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,10-12 * figures 1-2 * |