EP3206413 - CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL SYSTEM OF EARPHONE, AND EARPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goertek Inc. No. 268 Dongfang Road Hi-Tech Industry District Weifang, Shandong 261031 / CN | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Song No.268 Dongfang Road Hi-Tech Industry District Weifang Shandong 261031 / CN | 02 /
LOU, Shasha No.268 Dongfang Road Hi-Tech Industry District Weifang Shandong 261031 / CN | 03 /
LI, Bo No.268 Dongfang Road Hi-Tech Industry District Weifang Shandong 261031 / CN | 04 /
QI, Hui No.268 Dongfang Road Hi-Tech Industry District Weifang Shandong 261031 / CN | [2017/38] |
Former [2017/33] | 01 /
LIU, Song / KR | ||
02 /
LOU, Shasha / KR | |||
03 /
LI, Bo / KR | |||
04 /
QI, Hui / KR | Representative(s) | Qip Patentanwälte Dr. Kuehn & Partner mbB Goethestraße 8 80336 München / DE | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 16798070.5 | 21.07.2016 | [2017/33] | WO2016CN90873 | Priority number, date | CN20151122273 | 29.12.2015 Original published format: CN201511022273 | [2017/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017113768 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3206413 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3206413 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R3/00 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
H04R1/1041 (EP,US);
H04R1/1083 (EP,CN,US);
G08B21/182 (US);
G10K11/178 (US);
H04R3/00 (EP,US);
G10K2210/1081 (US);
H04R2420/07 (EP,US);
H04R2430/01 (EP,US);
H04R2460/01 (EP,US);
H04R2460/07 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | H04R1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | OHRHÖRERSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, OHRHÖRERSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND OHRHÖRER | [2017/33] | English: | CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL SYSTEM OF EARPHONE, AND EARPHONE | [2017/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'ÉCOUTEUR, ET ÉCOUTEUR | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2016 | Translation filed | 29.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 29.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.09.2019 | 27.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/11] | 24.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015222977 (ANGEL JR DONALD EARL [US]) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015264469 (MURATA YASUNOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0165] - [0178] - [0210] * | International search | [A]CN102973275 (WUXI SMART SENSING STARS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN204377107U (DONGGUAN YINGTONG WIRE LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN104771171 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN104954566 (SHANGHAI DROI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-3, 6, 9-14 * , claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2016100244 (GENTILE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* , the whole document *; | [PX]CN105611443 (GOERTEK INC) [PX] 1-15 * , claims 1-12 * |