EP3374588 - FLEXIBLE SEALS FOR INSULATED DOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rite-Hite Holding Corporation 195 S. Rite-Hite Way Milwaukee, WI 53204 / US | [2023/06] |
Former [2018/38] | For all designated states Rite-Hite Holding Corporation 8900 N. Arbon Drive Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53223 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWAN, Derek 2045 Morningview Road Dubuque, Iowa 52001 / US | 02 /
CASEY, Nicholas J. 114 Whitewater Drive Cascade, Iowa 52033 / US | 03 /
KERN, Rodney 2605 Lobo Lane Dubuque, Iowa 52001 / US | 04 /
HOERNER, William W. 2453 Matthew John Drive Dubuque, Iowa 52002 / US | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 16798607.4 | 08.11.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016US60946 | Priority number, date | US201514936091 | 09.11.2015 Original published format: US201514936091 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017083278 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3374588 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3374588 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/23, E06B3/46, F25D23/08 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
E06B3/4636 (EP,US);
E06B7/22 (US);
E06B7/2307 (EP,US);
E06B7/2309 (EP,US);
F25D23/021 (US);
F25D23/028 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/38] | E06B7/23, E06B3/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE DICHTUNGEN FÜR ISOLIERTE TÜREN | [2018/38] | English: | FLEXIBLE SEALS FOR INSULATED DOORS | [2018/38] | French: | JOINTS FLEXIBLES POUR PORTES ISOLÉES | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 04.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]NL134739C (HEYCOP [NL]) [X] 1,8,15 * figure 1 *; | [X]NL7608393 (HERPEN FREDERIK CORNELIS VAN) [X] 1,8,15 * figure 2 *; | [XAY]GB1537805 (INTELLECTUAL TRADE CY SA) [X] 1-4,6-8,15 * figures 2,4 * [A] 9-14 [Y] 5; | [XA]FR2422807 (HEYCOP BEHEER BV [NL]) [X] 1-3,8,15 * figures 1-4 * [A] 4-7,9-14; | [X]CH658295 (HAAB KARL, et al) [X] 1,15* figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2005060937 (DONDLINGER JASON [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0038]; figures 5,7 * | Examination | EP2615237 |