EP3322365 - METHODS, COMPOSITIONS AND TECHNIQUES FOR POLYDIMETHYLSILOXANE SURFACE MODIFICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orthobond, Inc. 675 Us Highway 1 Technology Centre Of New Jersey North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEVENGER, Randy 15 DeForest Avenue North Plainfield, NJ 07062 / US | 02 /
KIM, Se-Ho 9 Petunia Drive Apt. 2B North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | 03 /
KATZ, Jordan 38 Sherwood Road Short Hills, NJ 07078 / US | 04 /
CAICEDO-CARVAJAL, Carlos 551 Perry Drive North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | [2018/27] |
Former [2018/21] | 01 /
CLEVENGER, Randy 15 DeForest Avenue North Plainfield, NJ 07062 / US | ||
02 /
KIM, Se-Ho 9 Petunia Drive Apt. 2B North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | |||
03 /
KATZ, Jordan 67 Baltusrol Way Short Hills, NJ 07078 / US | |||
04 /
CAICEDO-CARVAJAL, Carlos 551 Perry Drive North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16800608.8 | 23.05.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016US33795 | Priority number, date | US201562165573P | 22.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562165573 P | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016191378 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3322365 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/42, A61L27/18, A61L27/54 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
C08F220/34 (EP,US);
C08G77/42 (EP);
A61L2300/208 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L83/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | A61B17/88, B32B27/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR POLYDIMETHYLSILOXANOBERFLÄCHENVERÄNDERUNGEN | [2018/21] | English: | METHODS, COMPOSITIONS AND TECHNIQUES FOR POLYDIMETHYLSILOXANE SURFACE MODIFICATIONS | [2018/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, COMPOSITIONS ET TECHNIQUES POUR MODIFICATIONS DE SURFACE DE POLYDIMÉTHYLSILOXANE | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 23.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 23.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 23.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2018 | Decision despatched | 23.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 23.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 23.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2018 | Decision despatched | 23.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 23.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US6248811 (OTTERSBACH PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * columns 4-8 * * columns 15-16 * * column 10 * [A] 4,13 [Y] 6-12,14,15; | [XAYI]US2002161065 (DITIZIO VALERIO [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0056] , [0063]; examples 2-3 * [A] 4,13 [Y] 6-12,14,15 [I] 6-12,14,15; | [XAY]US2002051812 (DICOSMO FRANK [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0034] - [0074] * [A] 4,13 [Y] 6-12,14,15; | [XAY]WO2014089680 (NANO SAFE COATINGS INC A FLORIDA CORP 3 P14000024914 [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 39 * [A] 4,13 [Y] 6-12,14,15; | [XAY]US2013040519 (LOCKLIN JASON J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * Scheme 4; paragraphs [0050] , [0117] * [A] 4,13 [Y] 6-12,14,15 | International search | [XY]US2013040519 (LOCKLIN JASON J [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 6/3-5, 7/3-5, 8/1-3, 9/8/1-3, 10/8/1-3, 11/10/8/1-3, 12/9/8/1-3, 14/1-3, 17, 20-25, 27/24-25, 28/24-25, 30-34, 39-49, 50/47-49, 51/47-49, 52/47-49, 53/52/47-49, 54/52/47-49, 55/54/52/47-49, 56/53 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0002], [0050], [0090], [0093], [0116]-[0117], [0129], [0139]-[0141], [0145], [0208]-[0209]; claim 13 * [Y] 13/1-3, 15/1-3, 16/1-3, 18-19, 26, 27/26, 28/26, 29/28/24-26, 35-38, 57/47-49, 58/26, 59/24-26, 59/47, 60, 62-63, 67-70; | [Y]US2012123012 (RHEINBERGER VOLKER [LI], et al) [Y] 15/1-3, 59/24-26, 59/47 * ; paragraphs [0087], [0089] *; | [Y]US2014357713 (DAMAJ BASSAM B [US], et al) [Y] 16/1-3, 26, 27/26, 28/26, 29/28/26, 58/26, 59/26, 60 * ; abstract; paragraph [0344] *; | [Y]US2014323676 (MEHRABI MANSOUR [AU], et al) [Y] 18-19, 62-63 * ; abstract; paragraph [0038] *; | [Y]US2011182960 (VAN DONGEN ELISABETH MARIANNA WILHELMINA MARIA [NL], et al) [Y] 29/28/24-26 * ; abstract; paragraph [0041] *; | [Y] - THOMPSON, MS et al., "Synthesis and applications of heterobifunctional poly(ethylene oxide) oligomers.", Polymer, (20080000), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 345 - 373, XP022422554 [Y] 13/1-3, 57/47-49 * ; abstract; page 365, column 2, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2007.10.029 | [Y] - NAKAYAMA et al., "Photocurable surgical tissue adhesive glues composed of photoreactive gelatin and poly (ethylene glycol) diacrylate.", Journal of biomedical materials Research, (19990000), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 511 - 521, XP002493603 [Y] 35-38 * ; abstract; page 513, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4636(1999)48:4<511::AID-JBM17>3.0.CO;2-V | [Y] - UZARSKI, JR. et al., "Reflection Absorption Infrared Spectroscopic Studies of Surface Chemistry Relevant to Chemical and Biological Warfare Agent Defense.", Dissertation submitted to the faculty of the Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University in partial fulfillment of the requirements for the degree of Doctor of Philosophy In Chemistry- Virginia Tech, (20090119), pages 1 - 269, URL: http://theses.lib.vt.edu/theses/available/etd-02032009-052713/unrestricted/JUzarski_Dissertation_ETD.pdf, (20160725), XP055332934 [Y] 67-70 * ; page 76, paragraph 2 * |