EP3302574 - PERSONALIZED DELIVERY VECTOR-BASED IMMUNOTHERAPY AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advaxis, Inc. 305 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETIT, Robert 149 Parsons Lane Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US | 02 /
PERRY, Kyle 2233 Town Courth North Lawrenceville, New Jersey 08648 / US | 03 /
PRINCIOTTA, Michael F. 222 Mercer Street Hightstown, New Jersey 08520 / US | 04 /
O'CONNOR, Daniel J. c/o Advaxis Inc. 305 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16800704.5 | 26.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US34301 | Priority number, date | US201562166591P | 26.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562166591 P | US201562174692P | 12.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562174692 P | US201562218936P | 15.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562218936 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016191545 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3302574 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, A61K38/16, C07K14/195, C12N15/74 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/195 (EP,KR,US);
A61K48/0008 (KR);
A61K39/02 (US);
A61K38/164 (KR);
A61K39/0011 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001106 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001119 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/00115 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001151 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001153 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001156 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001157 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001158 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001164 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001176 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001182 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001184 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001186 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001188 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/00119 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001191 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001193 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001194 (EP,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
C12N15/74 (KR,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
C12Q1/6806 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (US);
A61K2039/522 (US);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
A61K2039/585 (US);
C07K2319/00 (US);
C12N2510/02 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2537/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | 06.12.2017 | ME | 06.12.2017 | Validation states | MA | 06.12.2017 | MD | 06.12.2017 | Title | German: | AUF PERSONALISIERTEM AUSGABEVEKTOR BASIERENDE IMMUNTHERAPIE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/15] | English: | PERSONALIZED DELIVERY VECTOR-BASED IMMUNOTHERAPY AND USES THEREOF | [2018/15] | French: | IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE À BASE DE VECTEURS D'ADMINISTRATION PERSONNALISÉS, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 06.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2012068360 (ADURO BIOTECH [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2010189739 (FRANKEL FRED R [US], et al); | [A]WO2011020604 (PEVION BIOTECH AG [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2014052707 (UNIV CONNECTICUT [US]); |