EP3526449 - PARTIALLY-CAST, MULTI-METAL CASING FOR COMBUSTION TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPAN, Valentin Diane 500 Laval, Québec H7X 2P4 / CA | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2024/33] |
Former [2019/34] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16801116.1 | 14.11.2016 | [2019/34] | WO2016US61738 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018089023 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526449 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3526449 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, B22D19/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
F01D9/044 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (US);
B22C21/14 (EP,US);
B22C7/00 (EP,US);
B22C9/02 (EP,US);
B22C9/22 (US);
B22C9/28 (EP,US);
B22D19/00 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/21 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILWEISE GEGOSSENES GEHÄUSE AUS MEHREREN METALLEN FÜR EINE VERBRENNUNGSTURBINENMOTOR | [2019/34] | English: | PARTIALLY-CAST, MULTI-METAL CASING FOR COMBUSTION TURBINE ENGINE | [2019/34] | French: | CARTER POLYMÉTALLIQUE PARTIELLEMENT COULÉ POUR MOTEUR À TURBINE À COMBUSTION | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 13.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60116805 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]GB2177164 (TRW INC); | [A]EP1935531 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]WO2014052744 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) |