EP3384131 - FRICTION BOLT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATAJ, Mieczyslaw 42 Powell Street Charlestown, NSW 2290 / AU | 02 /
YOUNG, Peter 8 Magellan Court Bray Park, Queensland 4500 / AU | 03 /
DARLINGTON, Bradley 31 Shaftesbury Way Wellard, Western Australia 6170 / AU | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Sandvik Sandvik Mining and Construction Oy Patent Department PL 100 33311 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Sandvik Sandvik Mining and Construction Oy PL 100 Patent Department 33311 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2018/41] | Sandvik Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 16801765.5 | 25.11.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016EP78839 | Priority number, date | WO2015EP78063 | 30.11.2015 Original published format: PCT/EP2015/078063 | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017093138 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384131 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3384131 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21D21/00 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
E21D21/004 (EP,US);
E21D21/0026 (EP);
E21D21/0033 (EP,US);
E21D21/006 (US);
E21D21/008 (EP,US);
E21D21/0086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIBUNGSBOLZEN | [2018/41] | English: | FRICTION BOLT | [2018/41] | French: | BOULON À FROTTEMENT | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 16.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2016 | AL | 06.01.2021 | AT | 06.01.2021 | CY | 06.01.2021 | CZ | 06.01.2021 | DK | 06.01.2021 | EE | 06.01.2021 | HR | 06.01.2021 | IT | 06.01.2021 | LT | 06.01.2021 | LV | 06.01.2021 | MC | 06.01.2021 | MK | 06.01.2021 | MT | 06.01.2021 | RO | 06.01.2021 | RS | 06.01.2021 | SI | 06.01.2021 | SK | 06.01.2021 | SM | 06.01.2021 | NL | 06.02.2021 | BG | 06.04.2021 | NO | 06.04.2021 | IS | 06.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.11.2016 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 25.11.2016 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 25.11.2016 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 06.01.2021 | |
NO | 06.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4859118 (SCHAEFFER CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-22 * figure 6 *; | [XI]WO2010104460 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,21 * page 18, lines 5-9, 19-22; figure 5 * [I] 5,6; | [A]WO2012053965 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE], et al) [A] 1-22 * figure 3 *; | [XP]WO2015189146 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE]) [XP] 1-4,7,8,21,22* figures 2, 6, 8 * | by applicant | US4859118 | WO2010104460 | AU2012209052 |