EP3303279 - SEPARATION OF ORGANIC ACIDS FROM MIXTURES CONTAINING AMMONIUM SALTS OF ORGANIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lali, Arvind Mallinath DBT-ICT Centre for Energy Biosciences Institute of Chemical Technology University of Mumbai Nathalal Parikh Marg Matunga ( East) Mumbai 400 019 / IN | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURYA, Ritu Rahul DBT-ICT Centre For Energy Biosciences Institute Of Chemical Technology (deemed University) Nathalal Parikh Marg Matunga (east) Maharashtra Mumbai 400 019 / IN | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16802710.0 | 30.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016IN50162 | Priority number, date | IN2015MUM2090 | 29.05.2015 Original published format: IN 2090MU2015 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016194003 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3303279 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 09.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/46, C07C51/493, C07C51/09, C07C67/08 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
C07C51/09 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/08 (KR);
C07C51/42 (US);
C07C51/44 (KR);
C07C51/46 (EP,US);
C07C55/06 (KR);
C07C67/03 (US);
C07C67/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/62 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C51/09, C07C53/02 (EP,US);
C07C51/09, C07C53/08 (EP,US);
C07C51/09, C07C53/122 (US,EP);
C07C51/09, C07C59/08 (EP,US);
C07C51/46, C07C53/06 (US,EP);
C07C51/46, C07C53/10 (US,EP);
C07C51/46, C07C53/122 (US,EP);
C07C51/46, C07C59/08 (US,EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/06 (US,EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/14 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2018/15] | C07C51/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | TRENNUNG VON ORGANISCHEN SÄUREN AUS MISCHUNGEN MIT AMMONIUMSALZEN VON ORGANISCHEN SÄUREN | [2018/15] | English: | SEPARATION OF ORGANIC ACIDS FROM MIXTURES CONTAINING AMMONIUM SALTS OF ORGANIC ACIDS | [2018/15] | French: | SÉPARATION D'ACIDES ORGANIQUES À PARTIR DE MÉLANGES CONTENANT DES SELS D'AMMONIUM D'ACIDES ORGANIQUES | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 19.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 09.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014099429 (ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND CO [US]) [A] 1-5 * examples;; claims 1,2 *; | [A]CN102807486B (BEIJING XUYANG CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY RES INST CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO0064850 (STALEY MFG CO A E [US]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1,2 * | International search | [Y]WO0064850 (STALEY MFG CO A E [US]) [Y] 1-5 * . abstract, page-1 line 28-32, page 2, line 5-30, page-3, examples, claim 1, 40 *; | [Y]US6926810 (COCKREM MICHAEL CHARLES MILNER [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * . abstract, page 2-line 60-67, page 3, line 5-65, page 17-examples, claims 1, 40-41, 43, 47 *; | [Y]US6984293 (COCKREM MICHAEL CHARLES MILNER [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * . abstract, page 3-5, examples, claim 1, 30 *; | [Y]US3419478 (IZARD EMMETTE F) [Y] 1-5 * . page 3-4, examples, claim 1-5 *; | [Y]US2010210871 (KOBLER CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5 * . abstract,whole document *; | [Y]US2004210087 (MENG XIANGSHENG [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * . abstract, examples, claims 1, 26, 33, 53, 60, 80 *; | [Y]US6160173 (EYAL AHARON MEIR [IL], et al) [Y] 1-5 * . abstract, claims 1 and 39 * |