EP3305236 - MEDICAL MANIPULATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YORIMOTO Ryuichi c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
KOMURO Takahiro c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16802976.7 | 02.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016JP63555 | Priority number, date | JP20150109758 | 29.05.2015 Original published format: JP 2015109758 | [2018/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016194539 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3305236 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/018, A61B34/00, A61B34/37, B25J3/00, B25J3/04, B25J9/16, B25J13/02, B25J13/08 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
A61B34/37 (EP,US);
A61B1/00042 (EP,US);
A61B1/0005 (EP,US);
A61B1/00133 (EP,US);
A61B1/00149 (EP,US);
A61B1/009 (EP,US);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B34/74 (EP,US);
B25J13/02 (EP,US);
B25J13/088 (EP,US);
B25J3/00 (US);
B25J3/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | A61B34/37, B25J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES MANIPULATORSYSTEM | [2018/15] | English: | MEDICAL MANIPULATOR SYSTEM | [2018/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MANIPULATEUR MÉDICAL | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2017 | Translation filed | 11.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 11.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001104333 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0046] * * figures 4, 6 *; | [A]JP2003265500 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0067] , [ 0068] * * figure 1 *; | [X]JP2005335000 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0015] , [ 0018] , [ 0019] * * figures 2, 3, 5 *; | [A]US2009326318 (TOGNACCINI MARC E [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0048] , [ 0092] , [ 0093] , [ 0099] * * figures 19, 20 *; | [A]WO2013018936 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* figures 6, 7 * | International search | [X]JP2003265500 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0029], [0076] to [0102]; fig. 1, 2, 8 to 11 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005335000 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014028007 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2015/0094737 A1 & WO 2014/021122 A & EP 2881061 A1 & CN 104507411 A *; | [A]WO2014146095 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2014/0316430 A1 & EP 2969407 A1 & CN 105120788 A & KR 10-2015-0132326 A *; | [A]WO2014199415 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |