EP3305858 - INTERFERENCE PIGMENT, AND COSMETIC PREPARATION, COATING MATERIAL, INK, AND RESIN COMPOSITION EACH CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIOKI Masahiro c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-6321 / JP | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Golding, Louise Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16803336.3 | 31.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016JP66034 | Priority number, date | JP20150111637 | 01.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015111637 | [2018/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016194902 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3305858 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/06, A61K8/25, A61K8/26, A61Q1/04, A61Q1/06, C08K9/02, C08L101/00, C09C1/28, C09C1/40, C09D5/29, C09D11/037, C09D11/322, C09D201/00, C09C1/00 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
C09C1/0015 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/0266 (US);
A61K8/0229 (US);
A61K8/19 (KR,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/29 (KR,US);
A61Q1/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C09C1/0033 (EP,US);
C09C1/0078 (US);
C09C1/28 (KR,US);
C09C1/40 (KR);
C09C3/063 (US);
C09D11/037 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,KR,US);
C09D201/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/29 (EP,US);
C09D7/40 (EP,US);
C09D7/70 (US);
A61K2800/436 (US);
C09C2200/1008 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1025 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1029 (EP,US);
C09C2200/304 (EP,US);
C09C2200/306 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | C09C3/06, A61K8/25, A61K8/26, A61Q1/04, A61Q1/06, C08K9/02, C08L101/00, C09C1/28, C09C1/40, C09D5/29, C09D7/12, C09D11/037, C09D11/322, C09D201/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | INTERFERENZPIGMENT SOWIE KOSMETISCHES PRÄPARAT, BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL, TINTE UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2018/15] | English: | INTERFERENCE PIGMENT, AND COSMETIC PREPARATION, COATING MATERIAL, INK, AND RESIN COMPOSITION EACH CONTAINING SAME | [2018/15] | French: | PIGMENT INTERFÉRENTIEL ET PRÉPARATION COSMÉTIQUE, MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT, ENCRE ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE CONTENANT CHACUN CELUI-CI | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2017 | Translation filed | 22.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 22.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5436077 (MATSUBA TERUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15* claims 1-5 *; | [X]US2004112252 (ZIMMERMANN CURTIS J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] - paragraph [0013]; examples 2,4,8; claims 1-23 *; | [X]US2004115432 (ZIMMERMANN CURTIS J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0009] - paragraph [0020]; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP2213705 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] - [0 27] - [0038]; figure 1; claims 1-9 * | International search | [A]JPH04193725 (NIPPON GLASS FIBER CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-17 * , entire text & US 5436077 A entire text *; | [A]JPH1088026 (ECKART STANDARD BRONZEPULVER) [A] 1-17 * , entire text & US 2001/0007696 A1 entire text & EP 826745 A2 & DE 19635085 A & AU 3013197 A & CA 2214275 A1 *; | [A]JP2002516375 (Merck Patent GmbH) [A] 1-17 * , entire text & US 2003/0177950 A1 entire text & WO 1999/061529 A1 & EP 1090074 A1 & DE 19823866 A & CZ 20004372 A & TW 455620 B & AU 4362899 A & CN 1302314 A & KR 10-0625409 B1 *; | [A]JP2002535435 (Merck Patent GmbH) [A] 1-17 * , entire text & US 6747073 B1 entire text & WO 2000/043456 A1 & EP 1153087 A1 & DE 19901612 A1 & AU 2540800 A & TW 508366 B & CN 1425046 A *; | [A]JP2004510013 (Flex Products, Inc.) [A] 1-17 * , entire text & US 6686042 B1 entire text & WO 2002/024818 A1 & EP 1325086 A1 & CN 1471562 A *; | [A]JP2004522853 (Engelhard Corp.) [A] 1-17* , entire text & US 6440208 B1 entire text & WO 2002/042522 A2 & EP 1404895 A2 & DE 60122594 D & AU 3941602 A & CA 2427664 A & BR 115123 A & KR 10-0832195 B1 *; | [X]JP2006516154 (Engelhard Corp.) [X] 1-12, 14-17 * , claims; paragraphs [0005] to [0025], [0029]; examples & US 2004/0112252 A1 claims; paragraphs [0005] to [0021], [0025]; examples & WO 2004/055118 A2 & CN 1738869 A & AU 2003300928 A *; | [A]WO2006068255 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * , entire text & US 2008/0124559 A1 entire text & EP 1829833 A1 & DE 602005019202 D & CN 101087737 A & KR 10-2007-0105312 A & JP 4842839 B2 *; | [A]WO2008130040 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * , entire text & US 2010/0129412 A1 entire text & EP 2147954 A1 & CN 101675120 A & JP 5154547 B2 *; | [X]JP2008546880 (Ciba Holding Inc.) [X] 1-12, 14-17 * , claims; paragraphs [0010], [0014] to [0025]; examples & US 2009/0311209 A1 claims; paragraphs [0010], [0014] to [0025]; examples & WO 2007/054379 A1 & EP 1904586 A1 & KR 10-2008-0017485 A & CN 101203574 A *; | [X]JP2010538096 (Eckart GmbH) [X] 1-12, 14-17 * , claims; paragraphs [0013] to [0015], [0060] to [0066]; examples & US 2010/0116169 A1 claims; paragraphs [0013] to [0015], [0069] to [0076]; examples & WO 2008/122420 A1 & EP 1980594 A1 & CN 101675118 A & KR 10-2010-0016281 A * |