EP3306721 - METAL SEPARATOR STRUCTURE BODY FOR FUEL CELL, FUEL CELL AND FUEL CELL STACK USING SAME SEPARATOR STRUCTURE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKU, Takanori c/o NISSAN MOTOR Co. Ltd. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | 02 /
KUWATA, Shigemasa c/o NISSAN MOTOR Co. Ltd. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16803479.1 | 02.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016JP66497 | Priority number, date | JP20150113077 | 03.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015113077 | [2018/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016195045 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306721 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3306721 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/0206, H01M8/0232, H01M8/0267 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H01M8/0206 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0271 (KR,US);
H01M8/026 (US);
H01M8/02 (US);
H01M8/0202 (US);
H01M8/0232 (EP);
H01M8/0258 (KR);
H01M8/0267 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0273 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | H01M8/02, H01M8/0202, H01M8/0271, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLSEPARATORSTRUKTURKÖRPER FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLE, BRENNSTOFFZELLE UND BRENNSTOFFZELLENSTAPEL MIT DEM SEPARATORSTRUKTURKÖRPER | [2018/15] | English: | METAL SEPARATOR STRUCTURE BODY FOR FUEL CELL, FUEL CELL AND FUEL CELL STACK USING SAME SEPARATOR STRUCTURE BODY | [2018/15] | French: | CORPS DE STRUCTURE DE SÉPARATEUR MÉTALLIQUE POUR UNE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE, PILE À COMBUSTIBLE ET EMPILEMENT DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE UTILISANT CE MÊME CORPS DE STRUCTURE DE SÉPARATEUR | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | Translation filed | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 19.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2010003508 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract *; | [A]WO2010109795 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* page 11; figure 11 *; | [X]WO2014068854 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract *; | [XP]EP2916376 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-4,7,8 * paragraph [0054]; figure 10 * | International search | [A]JP2002260689 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , claim 6; paragraphs [0012], [0027], [0047], [0048]; fig. 3, 6 & US 2002/0146601 A1 claim 6; paragraphs [0014], [0045], [0065], [0066]; fig. 3, 6 *; | [A]JP2006156216 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0003], [0023], [0024]; fig. 8 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009117138 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-8 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0024], [0029], [0030]; fig. 3, 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010003508 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0026], [0028]; fig. 2(B) (Family: none) * |