EP3302673 - DYNAMIC WALLED TUBING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 29.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QMax, LLC 2829 Mission Street Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | [2018/18] |
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Duke Empirical, Inc. 2829 Mission Street Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LADUCA, Robert C. 100 Cottini Way Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16804255.4 | 31.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US35094 | Priority number, date | US201562168610P | 29.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562168610 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016196511 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3302673 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61L29/12, A61M25/10, B29C47/06, B29D23/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
A61M25/0023 (EP,CN,US);
A61M25/0052 (EP,CN,US);
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L29/12 (EP,CN,US);
A61L29/14 (EP,US);
B29D23/001 (CN);
A61M2025/0024 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/19 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | ROHRE MIT DYNAMISCHEN WÄNDEN | [2018/15] | English: | DYNAMIC WALLED TUBING | [2018/15] | French: | TUBE À PAROIS DYNAMIQUES | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5226888 (ARNEY MICHELLE [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2-22 *; | [XA]DE102005034529 (QUALIMED INNOVATIVE MED PROD [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0031] - [0042] * [A] 4-15; | [A]US2014121629 (MACAULAY PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 4-15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5538510 (FONTIRROCHE CARLOS A [US], et al) [Y] 11-13 * entire document *; | [Y]US6186978 (SAMSON GENE [US], et al) [Y] 5-7 * entire document *; | [XY]US6358238 (SHERRY JOHN [US]) [X] 1-4, 8-10, 14, 15 * entire document * [Y] 5-7,11-13; | [A]US2012283633 (VON HOFFMANN GERARD [US]) [A] 1-15* entire document * |