EP3302709 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR RNA-GUIDED TREATMENT OF HIV INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Temple University - Of The Commonwealth System of Higher Education Broad Street and Montgomery Avenue Philadelphia, PA 19122 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHALILI, Kamel 190 Presidential Boulevard Apt. 718 Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004 / US | 02 /
HU, Wenhui 224 Europa Court Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yonggang 48e Village of Stoney Run Maple Shade, NJ 08052 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2018/15] | HGF Limited 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | Application number, filing date | 16804274.5 | 01.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US35141 | Priority number, date | US201562169384P | 01.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562169384 P | US201562169633P | 02.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562169633 P | US201662308320P | 15.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662308320 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016196539 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3302709 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3302709 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/7088, // A61P31/18 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
A61K38/465 (EP,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (KR,US);
A61P31/18 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/1132 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/907 (US);
C12N9/22 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2310/10 (KR,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2320/11 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | C12N15/113, A61K31/712 | ||
Former IPC [2018/15] | A61P31/18, A61K48/00, C12N5/10, C12N15/63, C12N9/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN RNA-GEFÜHRTEN BEHANDLUNG VON HIV-INFEKTIONEN | [2018/15] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR RNA-GUIDED TREATMENT OF HIV INFECTION | [2018/15] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT GUIDÉ PAR ARN DE L'INFECTION PAR LE VIH | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 06.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21172750.8 / EP3919622 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2016 | AL | 19.05.2021 | AT | 19.05.2021 | CY | 19.05.2021 | EE | 19.05.2021 | FI | 19.05.2021 | HR | 19.05.2021 | LT | 19.05.2021 | LV | 19.05.2021 | MC | 19.05.2021 | MK | 19.05.2021 | MT | 19.05.2021 | RO | 19.05.2021 | RS | 19.05.2021 | SI | 19.05.2021 | SK | 19.05.2021 | SM | 19.05.2021 | LU | 01.06.2021 | BG | 19.08.2021 | NO | 19.08.2021 | GR | 20.08.2021 | IS | 19.09.2021 | PT | 20.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.06.2016 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
MK | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 01.06.2016 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 01.06.2016 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2015031775 (UNIV TEMPLE [US]) [I] 1-15 * pages 19-21 *; | [A] - W. HU ET AL, "RNA-directed gene editing specifically eradicates latent and prevents new HIV-1 infection", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20140721), vol. 111, no. 31, doi:10.1073/pnas.1405186111, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11461 - 11466, XP055155740 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1405186111 | [A] - KAMEL KHALILI ET AL, "Genome editing strategies: potential tools for eradicating HIV-1/AIDS", JOURNAL OF NEUROVIROLOGY, GB, (20150226), vol. 21, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s13365-014-0308-9, ISSN 1355-0284, pages 310 - 321, XP055534280 [A] 1-15 * pages 5-7; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13365-014-0308-9 | [A] - HIROTAKA EBINA ET AL, "Harnessing the CRISPR/Cas9 system to disrupt latent HIV-1 provirus", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20131201), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep02510, XP055534219 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep02510 | [A] - BRIAN WIGDAHL, "HIV Excision Utilizing CRISPR/Cas9 Technology: Attacking the Proviral Quasispecies in Reservoirs to Achieve a Cure", MOJ IMMUNOLOGY, (20141017), vol. 1, no. 4, doi:10.15406/moji.2014.01.00022, XP055534226 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.15406/moji.2014.01.00022 | [T] - R KAMINSKI ET AL, "Excision of HIV-1 DNA by gene editing: a proof-of-concept in vivo study", GENE THERAPY, GB, (20160801), vol. 23, no. 8 & 9, doi:10.1038/gt.2016.41, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 690 - 695, XP055534211 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2016.41 | International search | [X]WO2015031775 (UNIV TEMPLE [US]) [X] 1-4, 10, 11, 16-17, 19, 23-24, 26-27, 29-33, 38- 41, 48-49 * . Especially pg 2 para 2, pg 10 para 4, pg 11 para 4, pg 53 para 3, pg 54 para 2 sheet 1 fig 1C,D , sheet 14 Table S2, claim 89. *; | [A] - SAAYMAN et al., "The therapeutic application of CRISPR/Cas9 technologies for HIV.", Expert Opin Biol Ther, vol. 15, no. 6, pages 819 - 830, XP055408816 [A] 1-4, 10, 11, 16-17, 19, 23-24, 26-27, 29-33, 38- 41, 48, 49 * . Especially entire article (review). * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14712598.2015.1036736 | by applicant | US5034506 | WO2015031775 | - MANJUNATH et al., Viruses, (20130000), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 2748 - 2766 | - STONE et al., Curr. Opin. HIV AIDS., (20130000), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 217 - 223 | - GAGNON JA et al., PLoS One, (20140000), vol. 9, no. 12, page el 15987 | - W. HU et al., "RNA-directed gene editing specifically eradicates latent and prevents new HIV-1 infection", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (20140721), vol. Ill, no. 31, pages 11461 - 1146 | - KAMEL KHALILI et al., "Genome editing strategies: potential tools for eradicating HIV-1/AIDS", Journal of NeuroVirology, (20150226), vol. 21, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s13365-014-0308-9, pages 310 - 321, XP055534280 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13365-014-0308-9 | - HIROTAKA EBINA et al., "Harnessing the CRISPR/Cas9 system to disrupt latent HIV-1 provirus", Scientific Reports, (20131201), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep02510, XP055548923 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep02510 | - KORNBERG, A., Nucleotide Analogs, W. H. Freeman & Co., (19800000), pages 75 - 77 | - FREIERALTMANN, Nucl. Acid. Res., (19970000), vol. 25, no. 22, pages 4429 - 4443 | - TOULME, J.J., Nature Biotechnology, (20010000), vol. 19, pages 17 - 18 | - MANOHARAN M., Biochemica et Biophysica Acta, (19990000), vol. 1489, pages 117 - 139 | - FREIER S. M., Nucleic Acid Research, (19970000), vol. 25, pages 4429 - 4443 | - UHLMAN, E., Drug Discovery & Development, (20000000), vol. 3, pages 203 - 213 | - HERDEWIN P., Antisense & Nucleic Acid Drug Dev., (20000000), vol. 10, pages 297 - 310 | - N.K CHRISTIENSEN et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19980000), vol. 120, pages 5458 - 5463 | - AIDS. HU et al., PNAS, (20140000), vol. 111, page 114616 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. KM099233.1 | - DE MESMAEKER et al., Acc. Chem. Res., (19950000), vol. 28, pages 366 - 374 | - NIELSEN et al., Science, (19910000), vol. 254, page 1497 | - GEBEYEHU, G. et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19870000), vol. 15, page 4513 | - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Let., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 2765 - 278 | - LETSINGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, page 6553 | - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Let., (19940000), vol. 4, page 1053 | - MANOHARAN et al., Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 660, page 306 | - OBERHAUSER et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, page 533 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, page 111 | - KABANOV et al., FEES Lett., (19900000), vol. 259, page 327 | - SVINARCHUK et al., Biochimie, (19930000), vol. 75, page 49 | - MANOHARAN et al., Tetrahedron Lett., (19950000), vol. 36, page 3651 | - SHEA et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, page 3777 | - MANOHARAN et al., Nucleosides & Nucleotides, (19950000), vol. 14, page 969 | - MANNINOGOULD-FOGERITE, BioTechniques, (19880000), vol. 6, page 682 | - MAURER, R.A., Bethesda Res. Lab. Focus, (19890000), vol. 11, no. 2, page 25 | - HU P et al., Mol Ther Methods Clin Dev, (20150000), vol. 2, page 15025 | - LIU KC et al., Curr Gene Ther, (20140000), vol. 14, pages 3 52 - 364 | - SONG J et al., J Gen Virol, (20150000), vol. 96, pages 3131 - 3142 | - MADABHUSHI R et al., Cell, (20150000), vol. 161, pages 1592 - 1605 | - JADLOWSKY JK et al., Mol Cell Biol, (20140000), vol. 34, pages 1911 - 192 | - KOPP JB et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 1577 - 1581 | - HU W et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20140000), vol. 111, pages 11461 - 11466 | - DOENCH JG et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20140000), vol. 32, pages 1262 - 1267 | - SANDER JD et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20110000), vol. 29, pages 697 - 698 | - QIU P et al., Biotechniques, (20040000), vol. 36, pages 702 - 707 | - YANG L et al., Nat Commun, (20140000), vol. 5, page 5507 | - DAHLEM TJ et al., PLoS Genet, (20120000), vol. 8, page el002861 | - BASSETT ARLIU JL, J Genet Genomics, (20140000), vol. 41, pages 7 - 19 | - GUELL M et al., Bioinformatics, (20140000), vol. 30, pages 2968 - 2970 | - BRINKMAN EK et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (20140000), vol. 42, page el68 | - RAMANAN V et al., Sci Rep, (20150000), vol. 5, page 10833 | - PENG CLU MYANG D, Virol Sin, (20150000), vol. 30, pages 317 - 325 | - ZUCKERMANN M et al., Nat Commun, (20150000), vol. 6, page 7391 | - VERES A et al., Cell Stem Cell, (20140000), vol. 15, pages 27 - 30 | - RAN FA et al., Nature, (20150000), vol. 520, pages 186 - 191 | - TSAI SQ et al., NatBiotechnol, (20150000), vol. 33, pages 187 - 197 | - FROCK RL et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20150000), vol. 33, pages 179 - 186 | - RAN FA et al., Cell, (20130000), vol. 154, pages 1380 - 1389 | - MALI P et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 833 - 838 | - WYVEKENS N et al., Hum Gene Ther, (20150000), vol. 26, pages 425 - 431 |