EP3302762 - ULTRA-SELECTIVE CARBON MOLECULAR SIEVE MEMBRANES AND METHODS OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgia Tech Research Corporation 505 10th Street NW Atlanta, GA 30332-0415 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOROS, William John 505 Tenth Street N.W. Atlanta, Georgia 30332-0415 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Chen 505 Tenth Street N.W. Atlanta, Georgia 30332-0415 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 16804307.3 | 01.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US35217 | Priority number, date | US201562168982P | 01.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562168982 P | US201562169218P | 01.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562169218 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016196595 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3302762 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22, B01D71/02, B01D69/02, B01D67/00 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
B01D71/028 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/22 (EP,US);
B01D53/225 (KR);
B01D53/228 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0067 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0083 (KR);
B01D69/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2053/221 (KR);
B01D2053/224 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2256/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2256/16 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2256/245 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2317/00 (KR);
B01D2323/081 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2325/022 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | B01D53/22, B01D71/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | ULTRASELEKTIVE KOHLENSTOFFMOLEKULARSIEBMEMBRANE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2018/15] | English: | ULTRA-SELECTIVE CARBON MOLECULAR SIEVE MEMBRANES AND METHODS OF MAKING | [2018/15] | French: | MEMBRANES ULTRA-SÉLECTIVES DE TAMIS MOLÉCULAIRE EN CARBONE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 14.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4685940 (SOFFER ABRAHAM [IL], et al); | [X]EP0459623 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [X]US5288304 (KOROS WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [X]EP1034836 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]); | International search | [XY]US2002053284 (KOROS WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [XY]US8709133 (KIYONO MAYUMI [US], et al); | [A]US2015053079 (KOROS WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]US8999037 (SINGH RACHANA [IN], et al) |