EP3308131 - LOW PERMEABILITY SAMPLE BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vecere, William T. 1890 Brinston Drive Troy, Michigan 48083 / US | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 16804579.7 | 03.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016US35862 | Priority number, date | US201562171289P | 05.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562171289 P | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016197022 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3308131 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/22 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G01N1/2252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | PROBENBEUTEL MIT NIEDRIGER VISKOSITÄT | [2018/16] | English: | LOW PERMEABILITY SAMPLE BAG | [2018/16] | French: | POCHE À ÉCHANTILLON À BASSE PERMÉABILITÉ | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 04.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/22] | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2018 | 30.06.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5074155 (VECERE WILLIAM T [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10,12,15,16 * column 3, line 60- column 4, line 10; column 4, line 5-25 and line 35-39; column 5, line 13-20;; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 3-5 [I] 6-8,11; | [X]US5218874 (VECERE WILLIAM T [US]) [X] 1,13,14 * column 4, line 17-37;; claim 1 *; | [X]US2006246546 (JENKINS LAURI L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]EP1234521 (ARCADE MARKETING INC [US]) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0031] * | International search | [YA]US2013180345 (MIHAYLOV GUEORGUI M [US], et al) [Y] 1, 8-10, 13-18, 20-21 * (fig. 2A-2D, 3, 6C, paragraph [0014-0026], [0060-0065], abstract * [A] 2-7, 11-12, 19; | [Y]US5218874 (VECERE WILLIAM T [US]) [Y] 1, 8-10, 13-18, 20-21 * (fig. 1, 6-8, col. 1, lines 38-47, col. 2 line 57 - col. 3 line 6) *; | [A]US2011219891 (MIHAYLOV GUEORGUI [US], et al) [A] 1-21; | [A]US2014154370 (WOOD WILLARD E [US], et al) [A] 1-21 |