EP3417042 - WHITENING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC A Company Registered In England And Wales Under Company No. 41424 Of Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATCHELOR, Stephen, Norman Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
BIRD, Jayne, Michelle Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
COHRS, Carsten Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Industrial&Consumer Specialities Industriepark Höchst G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
DIEDERICHS, Jan Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Werk Gendorf GTI Geb. 114 Industrieparkstrasse 1 84508 Gendorf / DE | 05 /
LEINWEBER, Dirk Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH GTI Industriepark Höchst G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 06 /
MUTCH, Kevin, James Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Industrial&Consumer Specialities Industriepark Höchst G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 07 /
ROMANSKI, Steffen Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH GTI Industriepark Höchst G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | McHugh, Paul Edward Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | McHugh, Paul Edward Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16805031.8 | 22.11.2016 | [2018/52] | WO2016EP78457 | Priority number, date | EP20160156029 | 17.02.2016 Original published format: EP 16156029 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017140390 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417042 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3417042 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D3/42, C11D3/50, C11D1/37, C11D1/83, C11D3/40 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
C11D3/50 (EP);
C11D1/37 (EP);
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D3/40 (EP);
C11D3/42 (EP);
C11D1/06 (EP);
C11D1/123 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP);
C11D1/345 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLEICHUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/52] | English: | WHITENING COMPOSITION | [2018/52] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BLANCHIMENT | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 17.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2016 | AL | 07.08.2019 | AT | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | DK | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | NO | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IE | 22.11.2019 | LU | 22.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 22.11.2016 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.11.2016 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 22.11.2016 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NO | 07.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2007692 (RHONE POULENC IND) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 3-5 ** page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 8 *; | [AD]WO2012054820 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, lines 6-10 * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 12 * * page 5, line 12 - page 17, line 10 * * page 21, line 31 - page 23, line 33 * * page 27, lines 3-10; examples 1,6 * |