EP3383899 - MULTISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UCB Biopharma SRL Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states UCB Biopharma SRL Allé de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2018/41] | For all designated states UCB Biopharma SPRL 60, Allée de la Recherche 1070 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Michael John c/o IPD UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/41] | UCB Intellectual Property c/o UCB Celltech IP Department 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16805400.5 | 01.12.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016EP79435 | Priority number, date | GB20150021393 | 03.12.2015 Original published format: GB 201521393 | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017093406 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3383899 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C07K16/14, C07K16/46, C07K14/39 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
C07K16/468 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/39 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/14 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (US);
C07K2317/34 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | MULTISPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER | [2018/41] | English: | MULTISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES | [2018/41] | French: | ANTICORPS MULTISPÉCIFIQUES | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 10.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2022 | 09.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/19] | 30.12.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9311162 (PROTEIN DESIGN LABS INC [US]) [Y] 1-43 * page 3, lines 3-5 * * page 3, lines 21-23 * * figure 5 *; | [Y]WO03012069 (ABMAXIS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-43 * claims 1,4,5,10,11,17 * * figures 12-18 *; | [Y]WO2012116453 (ZYMEWORKS INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-43 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * examples 3,6,7 *; | [Y]WO2014001326 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [Y] 1-43 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 7 * * claims 1,16 * * example 13 * * figure 1 *; | [XP]WO2015181282 (UCB BIOPHARMA SPRL [BE]) [XP] 1-43* the whole document *; | [Y] - C ARNDT ET AL, "Costimulation improves the killing capability of T cells redirected to tumor cells expressing low levels of CD33: description of a novel modular targeting system", LEUKEMIA, (20140101), vol. 28, no. 1, doi:10.1038/leu.2013.243, ISSN 0887-6924, pages 59 - 69, XP055209228 [Y] 1-43 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 60, column l, paragraph 4 * * page 59, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 65, column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/leu.2013.243 | [Y] - D. M. GOLDENBERG ET AL, "Multifunctional Antibodies by the Dock-and-Lock Method for Improved Cancer Imaging and Therapy by Pretargeting", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (20080101), vol. 49, no. 1, doi:10.2967/jnumed.107.046185, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 158 - 163, XP055028152 [Y] 1-43 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.107.046185 | [Y] - HAIMING LUO ET AL, "Design and Applications of Bispecific Heterodimers: Molecular Imaging and beyond", MOLECULAR PHARMACEUTICS, (20140602), vol. 11, no. 6, doi:10.1021/mp500115x, ISSN 1543-8384, pages 1750 - 1761, XP055204892 [Y] 1-43 * page 1753, column l, paragraph 4 - page 1754, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mp500115x | [Y] - ZAHND CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Directed in vitro evolution and crystallographic analysis of a peptide-binding single chain antibody fragment (scFv) with low picomolar affinity", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (20040430), vol. 279, no. 18, doi:10.1074/JBC.M309169200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 18870 - 18877, XP002406477 [Y] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M309169200 | [Y] - HANES JOZEF ET AL, "Ribosome display efficiently selects and evolves high-affinity antibodies in vitro from immune libraries", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19981124), vol. 95, no. 24, doi:10.1073/PNAS.95.24.14130, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14130 - 14135, XP002165663 [Y] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.24.14130 | [A] - ROLAND KONTERMANN, "Dual targeting strategies with bispecific antibodies", MABS, LANDES BIOSCIENCE, US, (20120301), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.4161/MABS.4.2.19000, ISSN 1942-0870, pages 182 - 197, XP009160769 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.4.2.19000 | [A] - KO SANGHWAN ET AL, "Engineering antibodies for dual specificity and enhanced potency", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOPROCESS ENGINEERING, KOREAN SOCIETY FOR BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, SEOUL, KR, vol. 20, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S12257-014-0575-6, ISSN 1226-8372, (20150519), pages 201 - 210, (20150519), XP035504851 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12257-014-0575-6 |