EP3369276 - PAGING IN EXTENDED COVERAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) Torshamnsgatan 23 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Niklas Lovabacken 1 SE-590 45 Brokind / SE | 02 /
PERSSON, Claes-Göran Vimnevägen 16 SE-595 95 Mjölby / SE | 03 /
BERGQVIST, Jens Kärnmakaregatan 32 SE-587 37 Linköping / SE | 04 /
DIACHINA, John Walter 505 Kristin Drive Garner, North Carolina 27529 / US | 05 /
HOFSTRÖM, Björn Skonbergavägen 14 SE-589 41 Linköping / SE | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16805534.1 | 26.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016SE51041 | Priority number, date | US201562248332P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248332 P | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074250 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369276 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/04, H04W68/08, H04W68/12 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
H04W68/04 (EP,RU,US);
H04W68/02 (RU,US);
H04W68/005 (RU);
H04W68/12 (EP,RU,US);
H04W68/08 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | FUNKRUF BEI ERWEITERTER REICHWEITE | [2018/36] | English: | PAGING IN EXTENDED COVERAGE | [2018/36] | French: | TÉLÉAVERTISSEMENT DANS UNE COUVERTURE ÉTENDUE | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 13.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 25.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6023624 (HANSON ROBERT JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-20* column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 5 *; | [X]WO2015026285 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-20 * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 22 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 2 * * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 23 * * page 14, line 29 - page 17, line 16 * * page 19, line 10 - page 21, line 16 *; | [X] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Paging for release-13 low complexity UEs and enhanced coverage", vol. RAN WG2, no. Bratislava, Slovakia; 20150420 - 20150424, (20150411), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-151107-LC-MTC-PAGING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_89bis/Docs/, (20150411), XP050953220 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * |