EP3380444 - PLASTIC COMPONENT COMPRISING A CARBON FILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGL Carbon SE Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖTTINGER, Oswin Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | 02 /
RIVOLA, Dominik Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | 03 /
BACHER, Jürgen Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | [2018/40] | Application number, filing date | 16805750.3 | 24.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016EP78745 | Priority number, date | DE201510223238 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015223238 | [2018/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017089500 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3380444 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3380444 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/52, C04B35/532, C04B35/626, C04B41/48, B33Y10/00, B32B18/00, C04B41/83, C04B41/00, B29C64/165 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
C04B35/522 (EP,US);
B29C64/165 (EP,US);
B32B18/00 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/532 (EP,US);
C04B35/6269 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/4823 (EP,US);
C04B41/4853 (EP,US);
C04B41/488 (EP,US);
C04B41/83 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/422 (EP,US);
C04B2235/424 (EP,US);
C04B2235/425 (EP,US);
C04B2235/528 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5296 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5463 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6026 (EP,US);
C04B2235/608 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/52, C04B38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/40] | C04B35/52, B29C67/00, C04B35/532, C04B35/626, C04B41/45, C04B41/48, B33Y10/00, B32B18/00, C08J5/24, C08K3/04, C08K7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFF-BAUTEIL MIT KOHLENSTOFFFÜLLSTOFF | [2018/40] | English: | PLASTIC COMPONENT COMPRISING A CARBON FILLER | [2018/40] | French: | ÉLÉMENT EN PLASTIQUE CHARGÉ CARBONE | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 15.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2016 | AL | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | DK | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | ES | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | IT | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | MT | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | TR | 02.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | IE | 24.11.2020 | LU | 24.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | GB | 02.12.2020 | NO | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | PT | 04.01.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/34] | HU | 24.11.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
MT | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
BE | 30.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/32] | HU | 24.11.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
MT | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.11.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MT | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5124397 (KANAZAWA SHUJI [JP], et al) [X] 11,12,14,15 * column 1, line 1 - line 22; claim 1 * [Y] 13; | [XY]JPH05331314 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 11,12,14,15 * claim 1 * [Y] 13; | [Y]BG407Y (DRAZHEV TODOR I [BG]) [Y] 13* abstract *; | [XY]US2003044614 (NORLEY JULIAN [US], et al) [X] 10,12-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0017]; example 1 * [Y] 3,8,9; | [A]US2005003200 (NORLEY JULIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0017]; claim 1 *; | [X]US2008067477 (HAYAKAWA TOMONORI [JP], et al) [X] 11,12,14 * paragraph [0049]; example 1 *; | [X]JP2011068125 (GUNEI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 11,12,14 * example 1 *; | [XY]WO2015038260 (GRAFTECH INT HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,12,14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * [Y] 3,8,9; | [XP]WO2016089618 (EXONE COMPANY [US]) [XP] 1,2,4-8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0013] , [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0026] , [0032]; claims 1-3,8 *; | [X] - JOOHO MOON ET AL, "Fabrication of functionally graded reaction infiltrated SiC-Si composite by three-dimensional printing (3DP(TM)) process", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING: A, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010101), vol. 298, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0921-5093(00)01282-X, ISSN 0921-5093, pages 110 - 119, XP055272634 [X] 10,12 * experimental procedure;; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5093(00)01282-X | [X] - KAUSHIK ALAYAVALLI ET AL, "Fabrication of modified graphite bipolar plates by indirect selective laser sintering (SLS) for direct methanol fuel cells", RAPID PROTOTYPING JOURNAL, GB, (20100615), vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1108/13552541011049289, ISSN 1355-2546, pages 268 - 274, XP055343231 [X] 10,12-15 * paragraph [02.1]; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1108/13552541011049289 | Examination | US2003044614 | - Ssuwei Chen ET AL, "Development of SLS fuel cell current collectors", RAPID PROTOTYPING JOURNAL, GB, (20061001), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:10.1108/13552540610707031, ISSN 1355-2546, pages 275 - 282, XP055676279 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1108/13552540610707031 | by applicant | DE2947005 | EP0915129 | - PAUL J. ELLIS, "Shot Coke", LIGHT METALS, (1996), pages 477 - 484 |