EP3309738 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGATA, Takashi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KATSU, Masanori c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 16807171.0 | 02.03.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016JP56481 | Priority number, date | JP20150118930 | 12.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015118930 | [2018/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016199464 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3309738 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/10, G06F17/30 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G06F16/335 (EP);
G10L15/1815 (US);
G06F16/00 (US);
G06F16/3329 (US);
G06F16/9035 (EP);
G06Q50/01 (EP);
G06Q50/10 (US);
G10L15/26 (US);
H04L51/52 (EP);
G10L2015/228 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2018/16] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2018/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2017 | Translation filed | 10.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 16.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.07.2021 | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/41] | 06.06.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 01.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011029534 (MAEDA SHIGENORI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0021] ** paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0145] * | International search | [Y]JP2001195430 (ATR MEDIA INTEGRATION & COMM) [Y] 5-8 * , paragraphs [0049] to [0057] (Family: none) *; | [XY] - TSUYOSHI TANAKA, "Kodo Suitei o Mochiita Taimen Communication Sien System no Teian", Symposium on Multimedia, Distributed, Cooperative and Mobile Systems (DICOM02012) Ronbunshu IPSJ Symposium Series, vol. 2012, no. 1, ISSN 1882-0840, (20120704), pages 2359 - 2366, XP 009507731 [X] 1-4, 14, 15, 18, 19 [Y] 5-13, 16, 17 | [Y] - AKIRA IMAYOSHI, "Detection of Active Parts of Conversation in Real Time Using Laughter", FIT2011 Dai 10 Kai Forum on Information Technology Koen Ronbunshu, Sadokutsuki Ronbun· Ippan Ronbun, Gazo Ninshiki·Media Rikai, Graphics·Gazo, Human Communication & Interaction, Kyoiku Kogaku·Fukushi Kogaku· Multimedia Oyo, (20110822), vol. 3, pages 551 - 554, XP009507769 [Y] 9-13, 16, 17 |