EP3219247 - BENDING OPERATION DEVICE AND ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANO, Keisuke c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16807192.6 | 04.04.2016 | [2017/38] | WO2016JP61030 | Priority number, date | JP20150116100 | 08.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015116100 | [2017/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016199485 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3219247 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/005, G02B23/24, // A61B1/015 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
A61B1/0057 (EP,US);
A61B1/00042 (EP,US);
A61B1/00068 (EP,US);
A61B1/0052 (EP,US);
G02B23/24 (EP,US);
A61B1/015 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/38] | A61B1/00, G02B23/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Title | German: | BIEGEVORGANGSVORRICHTUNG UND ENDOSKOP | [2017/38] | English: | BENDING OPERATION DEVICE AND ENDOSCOPE | [2017/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT DE COURBURE ET ENDOSCOPE | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2017 | Translation filed | 13.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 13.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013047757 (OKAMOTO YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraphs [0209] , [0215] * * figures 6,14,18 *; | [X]US2013331652 (OKAMOTO YASUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2014309625 (OKAMOTO YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * figure 9 *; | [E]EP3192426 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0040] ** figures 1,4-6,8 * | International search | [YA]JP2010207598 (OLYMPUS CORP) [Y] 1-3, 7 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0023]; fig. 1 to 6 & US 2003/0092965 A1 paragraphs [0070] to [0095]; fig. 1 to 6 * [A] 4-6; | [A]WO2012117836 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0047755 A1 whole documents & WO 2012/117836 A1 & EP 2649921 A1 & CN 103327873 A *; | [Y]WO2015068468 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3, 7 * , paragraphs [0135] to [0137]; fig. 28 & JP 5877279 B2 * |